California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:21-cv-07071
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2021
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 28, 2022 12:28 AM PST
Defendant
Be Wicked, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel J Taylor
Musick Peeler And Garrett LLP
contact info
Peter Ko Chu
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman And Dicker LLP
contact info
Jura Christine Zibas
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman And Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Anthony M Keats
Represented By
Anthony M Keats
Keats Gatien LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leg Avenue, Inc.
Represented By
Margo J Arnold
Nolan Heimann LLP
contact info
Jordan David Susman
Nolan Heimann LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
41 41 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Mon 09/30 4:56 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (rolm)
Related: [-]
40 40 judgmentCV Permanent Injunction Mon 09/30 4:54 PM
ORDER PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald against defendant Be Wicked, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant Be Wicked, Inc. ("Defendant") and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and other persons who are in active concert or participation with anyone described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(d)(2)(A) or (B) shall permanently cease and desist from copying Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.'s ("Plaintiff") copyrighted designs. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
39 39 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 09/13 12:23 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE RE STIPULATION37 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 09/09 11:45 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, a Telephone Status Conference re Stipulation37 is set for 9/12/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Number: (877) 411-9748; Access Code: 6448503. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
37 37 stip Permanent Injunction Wed 09/07 4:28 PM
STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant copying Plaintiff's copyrighted designs filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc..(Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 28, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 07/28 3:50 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement34 filed July 27, 2022, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for September 12, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
35 35 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Wed 07/27 2:16 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Anthony M Keats: Mediation held on July 27, 2022 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Keats, Anthony)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Settlement Wed 07/27 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.. (Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
33 33 order Protective Order Tue 07/05 3:13 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Stipulation for Protective Order31 . See Order for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 06/29 3:28 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter Ko Chu counsel for Defendant Be Wicked, Inc.. Daniel J. Taylor is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc.. (Chu, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
31 31 stip Protective Order Tue 06/28 10:09 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc..(Chu, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 23, 2022
30 30 minutes Motion Hearing Compel Fri 06/24 1:53 PM
MINUTES OF Order Re: Motion to Compel [Dkt. 21] Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: The Court orders the parties to comply with the Court's procedures regarding stipulated protective orders. Defendant shall produce unredacted versions of all documents already produced, and complete its production of the requested documents, by no later than July 6, 2022. By July 7, 2022, Defendant must provide to Plaintiff's counsel a declaration stating that production is complete or providing good cause for any delay. Granting in part21 Motion to Compel. [See Order for further details.] n Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/21 4:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CUT-OFF DATES OF EXPERT AND NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-off is August 26, 2022; Expert Discovery Cut-off is September 9, 2022; and Last Day to Hear Motion is October 3, 2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
28 28 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Tue 06/21 10:24 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to Non-expert Discovery Cut-Off 8/26/22; Expert DIscovery Cut-off 9/9/22; and Last Day to Hear Motion 10/10/22 filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc..(Chu, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/14 10:17 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re: APPLICATION to Compel (1) Responses to Interrogatroires, (2) Response to Request for Production, (3) Production of Unredacted Documents 21 . The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing from June 15, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. to June 23, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. The hearing will be held via ZOOM. The continuance of the hearing date does not affect the due date for opposition and reply papers, which remain due based on the schedule calculated from the original hearing date. Zoom information was provided via email.THERE IS N O PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
26 26 stip Protective Order Wed 06/08 3:24 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc..(Chu, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
25 25 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 05/31 11:20 AM
REPLY in support of motion APPLICATION to Compel (1) Responses to Interrogatroires, (2) Response to Request for Production, (3) Production of Unredacted Documents 21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion to Compel 22 filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc..(Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jordan Susman iso Reply,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7
Monday, May 23, 2022
24 24 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/23 2:50 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Defendant To (1) Respond To Interrogatories, (2) Respond To Request For Production, (3) Produce Unredacted Documents filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc..(Chu, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Peter Chu with Exhibits A-M,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 20, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/20 9:07 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Gail J. Standish re: APPLICATION to Compel 21 The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing from June 13, 2022 to June 15, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. The hearing will be held via ZOOM. The continuance of the hearing date does not affect the due date for opposition and reply papers, which remain due based on the schedule calculated from the original hearing date. Clerk to provide zoom information via email.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
22 22 2 pgs motion Order Mon 05/16 11:49 AM
[[PROPOSED] ORDER filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Susman, Jordan) Modified on 5/16/2022 (es)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Compel Mon 05/16 11:33 AM
APPLICATION to Compel (1) Responses to Interrogatroires, (2) Response to Request for Production, (3) Production of Unredacted Documents filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish.(Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum iso Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jordan Susman iso Motion,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12
Friday, January 07, 2022
20 20 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Fri 01/07 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Anthony M Keats has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
19 19 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 01/05 9:07 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Anthony Keats may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 3/22/2022 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.(Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 11/16 4:11 PM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 1/10/2022. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 7/8/2022. Last Day to Hear Motions 8/8/2022. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 10/3/2022. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 10/24/2022 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 Days) set for 11/15/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 11/16 4:07 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/26/2022. A Status Report Regarding Settlement shall be filed no later than 10/3/2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 11/01 4:18 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 10/22 2:43 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc...(Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates
Friday, October 08, 2021
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 10/08 5:46 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 11/8/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
13 13 notice Appearance Thu 09/30 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter Ko Chu on behalf of Defendant Be Wicked, Inc. (Attorney Peter Ko Chu added to party Be Wicked, Inc. (pty:dft))(Chu, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/29 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc.. (Zibas, Jura)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/29 4:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Be Wicked, Inc..(Attorney Jura Christine Zibas added to party Be Wicked, Inc. (pty:dft))(Zibas, Jura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
10 10 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Wed 09/08 2:26 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Leg Avenue, Inc.. (Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
9 9 notice Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form Thu 09/02 3:31 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/02 3:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Be Wicked, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 09/02 3:26 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 09/02 3:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/02 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
4 4 1 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 09/01 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc., identifying Be Wicked, Inc.. (Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 09/01 6:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.. (Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 09/01 6:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.. (Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/01 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31915972 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Leg Avenue, Inc.. (Attorney Jordan David Susman added to party Leg Avenue, Inc.(pty:pla))(Susman, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1