Saber Interactive Inc v. Oovee Ltd et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John H Chun |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01201 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 1:06 AM PST |
Defendant
Zane Saxton
|
|
Defendant
Oovee Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Devin Milsom
|
|
Defendant
Vincent Milsom
|
|
Plaintiff
Saber Interactive Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
59 | 59
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case
Thu 12/08 8:27 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge John H. Chun re58 Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice . (AD) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
58 | 58
motion
Stipulated Motion
Wed 12/07 4:51 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice , filed by Plaintiff Saber Interactive Inc. Noting Date 12/7/2022, (Durrance, Nathaniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
57 | 57
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 12/05 3:20 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/19/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/3/2023. (AD) |