California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Case #: 2:21-cv-07105
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:3205 Garnishment
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Dec 13, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 1:22 AM PST
Defendant
Yi-Chi Shih
Represented By
James W Spertus
Spertus Landes And Umhofer LLP
contact info
Christa L Culver
Spertus Landes And Umhofer LLP
contact info
Michael Anthony Brown
Spertus Landes And Umhofer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Louisa O. Kirakosian
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Robert Ira Lester
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 13, 2021
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/13 4:25 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT (DKT. 1) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the reasons stated in this Order, Defendant's Ex Parte Application is GRANTED, the Government's Motion is GRANTED IN PART, and the Government's Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment is DENIED without prejudice. The conditions of Defendant's release remain in place, subject to the specific modifications stated in this Order. See minute order for details. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 11/02 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Ira Lester counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Louisa O. Kirakosian is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lester, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 10/25 8:17 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Ira Lester counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Robert I. Lester as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Lester, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 09/14 8:49 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christa L Culver counsel for Defendant Yi-Chi Shih. Adding Christa L. Culver Wasserman as counsel of record for Yi-Chi Shih for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yi-Chi Shih. (Attorney Christa L Culver added to party Yi-Chi Shih(pty:dft))(Culver, Christa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 09/14 8:39 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Anthony Brown counsel for Defendant Yi-Chi Shih. Adding M. Anthony Brown as counsel of record for Yi-Chi Shih for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yi-Chi Shih. (Attorney Michael Anthony Brown added to party Yi-Chi Shih(pty:dft))(Brown, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 09/14 8:34 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Defendant Yi-Chi Shih. Adding James W. Spertus as counsel of record for Yi-Chi Shih for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yi-Chi Shih. (Attorney James W Spertus added to party Yi-Chi Shih(pty:dft))(Spertus, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 09/03 10:50 AM
Text Only Entry re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . This case has been assigned to United States District of Judge John A. Kronstadt. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:21-cv-07105-JAK. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website atwww.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/02 6:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/02 5:46 PM
APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEES KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; TD AMERITRADE, INC. AND FIDELITY INVESTMENTS [28 U.S.C. § 3205(b)] AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. § 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Louisa O. Kirakosian added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Louisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT,
Att: 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR,
Att: 3 Proposed Order