Utah District Court
Judge:Tena Campbell
Case #: 1:21-cv-00124
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Jan 17, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 1:24 AM MST
Defendant
Jones Towing
Represented By
Cole S. Cannon
Cannon Law Group PLLC
contact info
Richard L. Jenson
Cannon Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Robos Towing
Represented By
Cole S. Cannon
Cannon Law Group PLLC
contact info
Richard L. Jenson
Cannon Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Moss
Represented By
Eric Stephenson
Stephenson Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Outsource Receivables Management
Terminated: 10/26/2021


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, January 17, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Mon 01/17 9:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jacob Moss (Stephenson, Eric)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/18 11:22 AM
Civil Case Terminated per16 Notice - CASE CLOSED (alt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement (Atty) Thu 12/16 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jacob Moss (Stephenson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
14 14 misc Modification of Docket Mon 12/06 1:27 PM
Modification of Docket: re 13 Reassignment to District Judge - docket text was modified to show not all forms were received. (jwt)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Reassignment to District Judge Mon 12/06 1:23 PM
All Consent/Reassignment Forms have not been received. Case Reassigned to District Judge for failure of all parties to return the form(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (jwt) Modified on 12/6/2021 (jwt)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 11/29 1:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Jones Towing, Robos Towing. Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Jones Towing(pty:dft), Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Robos Towing(pty:dft)(Cannon, Cole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Reminder Thu 11/18 1:29 PM
NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the9 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice. [LINK:Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form] (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
10 10 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Wed 11/10 8:24 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Jones Towing and Robos Towing. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Mon 11/01 8:07 AM
NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use[LINK:the form on this link] or use the included form for non-efilers and send it to consents@utd.uscourts.gov within 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Jones Towing, Robos Towing, Plaintiff Jacob Moss. Form due by 11/16/2021. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/29 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Jenson on behalf of Jones Towing, Robos Towing (Jenson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Tue 10/26 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Outsource Receivables Management filed by Plaintiff Jacob Moss (Stephenson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
6 6 4 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Fri 09/03 10:58 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/3/21. (alf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 09/02 4:10 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Robos Towing. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 09/02 4:10 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Outsource Receivables Management. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 09/02 4:09 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Jones Towing. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint (Atty) Thu 09/02 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4101331) filed by Jacob Moss. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Stephenson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet for FDCPA Complaint
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Thu 09/02 2:54 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Jacob Moss is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)
Related: [-]