California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:21-cv-06858
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Oct 05, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 1:08 AM PST
Defendant
Avigilon Corporation
Defendant
Avigilon Fortress Corporation
Defendant
Avigilon Patent Holding 1 Corporation
Defendant
Avigilon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff
Verkada, Inc.
405 E. 4th Ave.
San Mateo, CA 94401
Represented By
Jodie W. Cheng
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Iman Lordgooei
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Sean Sang-Chul Pak
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 14, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/14 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Verkada, Inc. (Lordgooei, Iman)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/14 4:17 PM
NOTICE by Verkada, Inc. re Developments in ITC Inv. No. 337-TA-1281 (Lordgooei, Iman)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/03 10:18 AM
ORDER. In light of the stay, Dkt. No. 12, the initial case management conference set for December 9, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/3/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
12 12 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/05 9:38 AM
ORDER. Plaintiffs motion to stay, Dkt. No. 11, is granted and the case is administratively closed. The parties are directed to promptly advise the Court of any developments in the ITC investigation. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
11 11 5 pgs motion Stay Fri 10/01 1:20 PM
MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 (Unopposed) filed by Verkada, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/15/2021. Replies due by 10/22/2021.(Pak, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 09, 2021
10 10 13 pgs order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 09/09 8:02 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/08 10:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/8/2021.(bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, September 02, 2021
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/02 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16353203.). Filed byVerkada, Inc..(Pak, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet