Premier, Inc. et al v. The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Frank D Whitney |
Referred: | David S Cayer |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00462 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC
32 Dean Road
Carmel, NY 10512 |
|
Plaintiff
Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Premier, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/17 11:40 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to submit further documentation setting forth the amount of their reasonable attorneys fees, expenses, and costs by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP, Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2022 (Wilson, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 6.16.22 Kafes Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 6.17.22 Screenshot of premieralternative.com, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/17 12:15 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to submit further documentation setting forth the amount of their reasonable attorneys fees, expenses, and costs. Attorneys fees, expenses and costs documentation due by 7/30/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/17/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG) |
||
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Tue 06/14 7:48 AM
REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (clc) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 06/09 12:25 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/8/22. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 01/25 1:55 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP, Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier, Inc.. (Wilson, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 23, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 12/23 8:33 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (clc) |
|
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Entry of Default
Fri 12/03 4:06 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP, Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier, Inc.. (Wilson, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 11/29 2:40 PM
ORDER denying 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The magistrate judges order entered in this case, (Doc. No. 10), thus continues to control the deadlines for Defendant to secure counsel and/or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/29/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 11/01 11:34 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC. (filed by Board President, J. Michael Kafes) (clc) |
|
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike
Thu 10/28 3:30 PM
ORDER The 9 MOTION to Strike 8 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED and the 8 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Appoint Counsel for Defendant is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/28/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek) |
|
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Strike
Tue 10/12 9:54 AM
MOTION to Strike8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP, Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (Wilson, J.) Motion referred to David S. Cayer. Modified to add magistrate referral on 10/12/2021 (clc) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 10/12 2:11 PM
Motion referred to David S. Cayer9 MOTION to Strike8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time (clc) |
||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/28 11:37 AM
Pro Se MOTION to Dismiss re1 COMPLAINT by The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (js) Modified to add relationship on 9/28/2021 (js) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 09/17 4:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Premier, Inc., Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP. The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Wilson, J.) |
|
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/07 8:37 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) |
|
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/03 10:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc. (Wilson, J.) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Fri 09/03 8:40 AM
REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (eef) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/03 8:37 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (eef) |
||
Thursday, September 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/02 6:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP (Wilson, J.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/02 6:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier, Inc. (Wilson, J.) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/02 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT against The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5201902), filed by Premier, Inc., Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP.(Wilson, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '964, '034, '211 Registrations, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - PREMIER-Formative Registrations, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - SEC Filing, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 7.21.21 Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 7.30.21 Letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 8.6.21 Letter |