Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00088
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2021
Terminated:Feb 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 03, 2021 3:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Jeremy Skeens (1)
Represented By
Richard W Monahan
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anthony Springer
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO May 10 2022
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS (Doc. 22). Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/10/2022. (kaf)

Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 5:26 PM EST
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
1 1 8 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Jeremy Skeens (1) count(s) 1-2, 3-5, 6-10, 11-17, and Forfeiture Allegations 1 & 2. (art)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Granting USA's Motion to Seal Case as to Jeremy Skeens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/4/2021. (art)
Related: [-]