Montana District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00058
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 04, 2021 1:33 AM MDT
Defendant
Rachell Sheree Abbott (1)
Represented By
Rachel Julagay
Federal Defenders Of Montana - Great Falls
contact info
Paul Gallardo
Flaherty Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Mickey James Buchholz (2)
Defendant
Brittany Michele Darnell (3)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Betley
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Great Falls
contact info
Jeffrey K. Starnes
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Great Falls
contact info

GPO Jun 14 2022
JUDGMENT as to Mickey James Buchholz (2): Counts 1, 2, 16 - Dismissed. Count 5 - BOP 12 MONTHS. This term consists of 12 months in CR 21-58-GF-BMM-02 and 12 months in CR 22-34-GF-BMM-01, to run concurrently. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of : three (3) years. This term consists of 3 years in CR 21-58-GF-BMM-02 and 3 years in CR 22-34-GF-BMM-01, to run concurrently. Special Assessment - $100 Restitution - $387. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/14/2022. (SLR)
GPO Aug 18 2023
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Mickey James Buchholz re 96 Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/18/2023. (TLO)
GPO Sep 11 2023
ORDER ADOPTING 103 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Mickey James Buchholz. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/11/2023. (ACC)
GPO Aug 29 2024
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Rachell Sheree Abbott. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/29/2024. (TLO)
GPO Sep 18 2024
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Mickey James Buchholz re 137 Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/18/2024. (ACC)
GPO Oct 03 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 129 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Mickey James Buchholz. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/3/2024. (ACC)
GPO Apr 30 2025
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Rachell Sheree Abbott re 152 Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/30/2025. (ACC)
GPO Apr 30 2025
ORDER ADOPTING 160 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Rachell Sheree Abbott. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/30/2025. (ACC)

Docket last updated: 09/04/2021 2:22 AM MDT
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Rachell Sheree Abbott (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, 6-15, 16-28, Mickey James Buchholz (2) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 16, Brittany Michele Darnell (3) count(s) 1, 2-3, 16-17. (ACC)
Related: [-]
2 2 Redacted Indictment as to Rachell Sheree Abbott, Mickey James Buchholz, Brittany Michele Darnell. (ACC)
Related: [-]
3 3 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Rachell Sheree Abbott. (ACC)
Related: [-]
4 4 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Mickey James Buchholz. (ACC)
Related: [-]
5 5 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Brittany Michele Darnell. (ACC)
Related: [-]