Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-11002

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:21-ap-51033
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Agri Exim DCMM
Represented By
Agri Exim DCMM
contact info
Defendant
Suminter India Organics Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By
Suminter India Organics Pvt. Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipeline Foods, LLC
6499 University Avenue NE Suite 200
Fridley, MN 55432
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, June 29, 2023
8 8 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 06/29 10:21 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Suminter India Organics Pvt. Ltd.. Related [+] (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-] ument7
Thursday, May 25, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/25 7:03 AM
Amended Complaint to Modify Nature of Suit Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 9/22/2023. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, May 06, 2022
6 6 notice Substitution of Counsel- Notice Fri 05/06 3:36 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff Pipeline Foods, LLC Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 07, 2022
5 5 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 01/07 11:33 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of DGR Legal, Inc. re: Service of Complaint and Summons on Agri Exim DMCC Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 11/19 10:59 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Suminter India Organics Pvt. Ltd.. Related [+] (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 11/19 10:57 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Agri Exim DCMM. Related [+] (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/07 12:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51033 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10480832, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 04, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 09/04 7:18 PM
Adversary case 21-51033 Complaint for (I) Turnover of Estate Property and an Accounting Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §542(a) or, Alternatively, for Breach of Contract and Conversion, and (II) for Damages for Defendants Violations of the Automatic Stay of 11 U.S.C. § 362(a) by Pipeline Foods, LLC against Agri Exim DCMM, Suminter India Organics Pvt. Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agri Exim Contract
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Suminter Contract
Att: 3 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives