DOE v. Franklin Square Union Free School District et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-05012 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 06, 2022 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
Franklin Square Union Free School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Howard Zucker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary T Bassett
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
66 | 66
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 04/25 10:16 AM
ORDER of USCA as to65 Notice of Appeal filed by Jane Doe. We therefore AFFIRM in part and REVERSE in part the Judgment of the District Court. We REMAND for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Certified Copy Issued: 4/25/2024. USCA# 23-582. (VJ) |