Bohnak et al v. Trusted Media Brands, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:21-cv-07476 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 06, 2022 3:54 AM EST |
Defendant
Trusted Media Brands, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha M. Bohnak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Jo Terzoli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Helton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connie Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sue Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda Loomis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Sepulveda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Trantum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
![]() MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Debbie Jo Terzoli, Martha M. Bohnak, Leslie Trantum, Juan Sepulveda, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Donna Brown, Tammy Johnson, Belinda Loomis, Sue Jones, Cynthia Brown. USCA Case Number 23-0741 The Court's order at docket entry 18 is hereby amended to clarify that it was issued on May 23, 2023. The parties' stipulation to dismiss the appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) was approved, and the case dismissed, on May 23, 2023. Issued As Mandate: 7/31/2023.. (tp) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 08/01 9:46 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:39 USCA Mandate. (tp) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
![]() MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Debbie Jo Terzoli, Martha M. Bohnak, Leslie Trantum, Juan Sepulveda, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Donna Brown, Tammy Johnson, Belinda Loomis, Sue Jones, Cynthia Brown USCA Case Number 23-0741 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 5/23/2023..(tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 05/23 12:15 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:38 USCA Mandate. (tp) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL from36 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Cynthia Brown, Donna Brown, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Tammy Johnson, Sue Jones, Belinda Loomis, Juan Sepulveda, Debbie Jo Terzoli, Leslie Trantum. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27672972. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 04/28 3:31 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:37 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Fri 04/28 3:32 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Debbie Jo Terzoli, Martha M. Bohnak, Leslie Trantum, Juan Sepulveda, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Donna Brown, Tammy Johnson, Belinda Loomis, Sue Jones, Cynthia Brown were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() OPINION & ORDER re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint . filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant TMBI's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 24 and terminate the action. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/29/2023) (ate) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
![]() NOTICE of Third Notice of Supplemental Authority re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
![]() RESPONSE re:33 Notice (Other), to Plaintiffs' December 1, 2022 Notice of Supplemental Authority . Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint .,27 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,26 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Cynthia Brown, Donna Brown, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Tammy Johnson, Sue Jones, Belinda Loomis, Juan Sepulveda, Debbie Jo Terzoli, Leslie Trantum..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Philip L. Fraietta dated November 28, 2022 re: Defendant's November 28, 2022 submission of a Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Cynthia Brown, Donna Brown, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Tammy Johnson, Sue Jones, Belinda Loomis, Juan Sepulveda, Debbie Jo Terzoli, Leslie Trantum..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Second Notice of Supplemental Authority re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Philip L. Fraietta dated October 28, 2022 re: Defendant's October 26, 2022 submission of a Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Cynthia Brown, Donna Brown, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Tammy Johnson, Sue Jones, Belinda Loomis, Juan Sepulveda, Debbie Jo Terzoli, Leslie Trantum..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
![]() DECLARATION of Kristen C. Rodriguez in Support re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
27 | 27
![]() REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
26 | 26
![]() MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Cynthia Brown, Donna Brown, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Tammy Johnson, Sue Jones, Belinda Loomis, Juan Sepulveda, Debbie Jo Terzoli, Leslie Trantum..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
25 | 25
![]() MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint . Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Hauser, Sandra) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter Oral Argument Request for Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Oral argument is discretionary and the Court will schedule same if it believes oral argument is warranted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/23/22) (yv) |
|
22 | 22
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kristen C. Rodriguez dated May 23, 2022 re: Oral Argument Request for Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:20 Response filed by Debbie Jo Terzoli, Martha M. Bohnak, Leslie Trantum, Juan Sepulveda, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Donna Brown, Tammy Johnson, Belinda Loomis, Sue Jones, Cynthia Brown,19 Letter filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has reviewed Defendant's letter dated April 18, 2022 (ECF No. 19), and Plaintiffs' letter dated April 21, 2022 (ECF No. 20). Defendant's request for a conference is denied and the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendant is granted leave to file the proposed motion with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's moving papers shall be served (not filed) on or before May 23, 2022; Plaintiffs' opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on or before June 22, 2022; Defendant's reply papers shall be served on or before July 7, 2022. All motion documents shall be filed on the reply date, July 7, 2022. The parties are directed to mail two courtesy copies of their motion documents to Chambers as they are served. ( Motions due by 7/7/2022.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/21/2022) (ate) Modified on 4/21/2022 (ate) |
|
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE re:19 Letter . Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Cynthia Brown, Donna Brown, Kathleen Helton, Connie Johnson, Tammy Johnson, Sue Jones, Belinda Loomis, Juan Sepulveda, Debbie Jo Terzoli, Leslie Trantum..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/21 4:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/7/2022. (ate) |
||
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kristen C. Rodriguez dated April 18, 2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference for a Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kristen Rodriguez dated 2/15/2022 re: request for extension of time to file response to Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request for an extension is granted. Defendant is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or by April 18, 2022., Trusted Media Brands, Inc. answer due 4/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/15/2022) (ate) |
|
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Trusted Media Brands, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Debbie Jo Terzoli, Martha M. Bohnak, Belinda Loomis, Donna Brown, Juan Sepulveda, Sue Jones, Kathleen Helton, Cynthia Brown, Tammy Johnson, Connie Johnson, Leslie Trantum. Related document:1 Complaint..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:15 Letter filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Oral argument is discretionary and the Court will schedule same if it believes oral argument is warranted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/6/2022) (kv) |
|
15 | 15
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kristen Rodriguez dated January 6, 2022 re: Oral Argument Request. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER granting12 Motion for Kristen Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion (doc. 12). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/9/2021) (ate) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Hauser, Sandra) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 12/07 1:35 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Kristen Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25430065. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Kristen Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25430065. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Rodriguez, Kristen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:9 Letter filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has reviewed Defendant's letter dated December 3, 2021, (ECF No. 9). Defendant's request for a conference is denied and the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendant is granted leave to file the proposed motion with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's moving papers shall be served (not filed) on or before January 6, 2022; Plaintiffs' opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on or before February 7, 2022; Defendant's reply papers shall be served on or before February 22, 2022. All motion documents shall be filed on the reply date, February 22, 2022. The parties are directed to mail two courtesy copies of their motion documents to Chambers as they are served. ( Motions due by 2/22/2022.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/6/2021) (ate) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting8 Motion for Natalie J. Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/6/2021) (ate) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 12/06 10:30 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25421448. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Sandra D. Hauser dated December 3, 2021 re: Request for a Pre-Motion Conference regarding Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Hauser, Sandra) |
|
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25421448. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Spears, Natalie) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Sandra D. Hauser dated October 1, 2021 re: Counsel for the Defendant writes to request an extension of time forTMBI to answer, move, or otherwise plead to the Complaint by 60 days, to and including December 3, 2021. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request is GRANTED. Defendant is directd to respond to the Complaint on or by December 3, 2021. Trusted Media Brands, Inc. answer due 12/3/2021. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/4/2021) (tg) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(Hauser, Sandra) |
|
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Trusted Media Brands, Inc. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. Service was accepted by Christopher Boyd, Registered Agent. Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak; Debbie Jo Terzoli..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trusted Media Brands, Inc...(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 09/08 10:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1453; Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 09/08 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Martha M. Bohnak; Debbie Jo Terzoli. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 09/08 10:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 09/08 10:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 09/08 10:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TRUSTED MEDIA BRANDS, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Debbie Jo Terzoli..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25028728)Document filed by Martha M. Bohnak, Debbie Jo Terzoli..(Fraietta, Philip) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |