Duplechain v. C & C Technologies Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | C Michael Hill |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-02402 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:30104 Personal Injury to or Death of Seamen |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 3:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
C & C Technologies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noble Energy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T G H U S Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W Duplechain
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 08/20 8:42 AM
ORDER granting34 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above entitled and numbered suit by DAVID W. DUPLECHAIN be and it is dismissed with full prejudice as to defendants, C&C TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NOBEL ENERGY, INC., FISHBONE SAFETY SOLUTIONS, LTD, AND TGH (U.S), INC. d/b/a GEOSCIENCE EARTH AND MARINE SERVICES, INC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff and defendants will bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/18/15. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order Dismissing Case (30, 60, 90 day) 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 08/20 8:37 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - 60 days. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/18/15. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 08/14 3:50 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by David W Duplechain, T G H U S Inc, Noble Energy Inc, Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd, C & C Technologies Inc.(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified on 8/14/2015 to add filers (Williams, L) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Tue 06/09 5:44 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline. Discovery deadline 7/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 6/9/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension (Other)
Tue 06/02 5:13 PM
Ex Parte MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Discovery Deadline with consent by C & C Technologies Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 LR 7.9 Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/27 5:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd. (aty,Bridger, Robert) |
|
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 04/27 5:40 PM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd.(aty,Bridger, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure-2nd NOTICE (Form Included)
Fri 04/24 9:47 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re:25 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Robert Jeffrey Bridger on behalf of Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd. Show Cause Response due by 5/8/2015. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/09 11:37 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T G H U S Inc identifying Corporate Parent Forum U S Inc, Other Affiliate Forum Energy Technologies Inc for T G H U S Inc. (aty,Zaunbrecher, Christopher) Modified on 4/9/2015 to correct Corporate Parent(Dauterive, C) |
|
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 04/09 9:24 AM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by T G H U S Inc.(Attorney Christopher Leonard Zaunbrecher added to party T G H U S Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Zaunbrecher, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/07 1:04 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint,20 Amended Complaint. Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd answer due 4/27/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 4/7/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 04/07 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Robert Jeffrey Bridger on behalf of Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/21/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/06 4:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,20 Amended Complaint with consent by Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(Attorney Robert Jeffrey Bridger added to party Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd(pty:dft))(aty,Bridger, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order granting extension of time to file responsive pleadings | ||
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/01 1:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W Duplechain. Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (aty,DeJean, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/23 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W Duplechain. T G H U S Inc served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (aty,DeJean, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Mon 03/09 9:03 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd, T G H (U S) Inc (crt,Yocum, M) |
|
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/09 9:02 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against C & C Technologies Inc, Noble Energy Inc, T G H (U S) Inc, and Fishbone Safety Solutions Ltd filed by David W Duplechain.(crt,Yocum, M) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 03/09 8:52 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 03/07/2015. (crt,Yocum, M) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 03/05 5:48 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, with consent by David W Duplechain. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Tue 02/03 4:05 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Joinder and Pleadings Amendment Deadline. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 3/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 2/3/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Tuesday, January 27, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension (Other)
Tue 01/27 11:23 AM
Consent MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Joinder and Pleadings Amendment Deadline with consent by Noble Energy Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(aty,Stuart, Cory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 26, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 Phase I RULE 26(f) Report by David W Duplechain, C & C Technologies Inc and Noble Energy Inc.(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) Modified on 11/26/2014 to add filers (Dauterive, C). | |
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/1/2016 9:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2016 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/30/2014. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/13/2014. Rule 26 Report due by 11/28/2014. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 2/3/2015. Discovery deadline 6/8/2015. Rule 26 Report - PHASE II due by 7/15/2015. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/15/2015. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/24/2015. Expert Depositions due by 10/13/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2015. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 12/22/2015. Motions in Limine due by 12/22/2015. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/7/2016. Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2016. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 10/09/14. (crt,Guidry, C) | |
Friday, October 03, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Noble Energy Inc.(aty,Stuart, Cory) | |
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C & C Technologies Inc identifying Corporate Parent Global Fusion Inc for C & C Technologies Inc. (aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified on 10/2/2014 to edit text(Williams, L). | |
11 | 11 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by C & C Technologies Inc.(Attorney Douglas W Truxillo added to party C & C Technologies Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) | |
Wednesday, September 24, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jon D Picou, Wilson L Maloz, III and Cory Thomas Stuart for Noble Energy Inc. Attorney Taylor P Mouledoux and Gerald F Slattery, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 9/24/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C) | |
Thursday, September 18, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney J. Daniel Picou, Esq., Wilson L. Maloz, III, Esq., and Cory T. Stuart, Esq. in place of Gerald F. Slattery, Jr., Esq. and Taylor P. Mouledoux, Esq. with consent by Noble Energy Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(Attorney Cory Thomas Stuart added to party Noble Energy Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Stuart, Cory) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noble Energy Inc. (aty,Mouledoux, Taylor) | |
Friday, September 05, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, Noble Energy Inc answer due 9/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 9/5/14. (crt,Guidry, C) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Gerald F Slattery, Jr on behalf of Noble Energy Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/19/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C) | |
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by Noble Energy Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(Attorney Gerald F Slattery, Jr added to party Noble Energy Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Slattery, Gerald) | |
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Thursday, August 21, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W Duplechain. C & C Technologies Inc served on 8/11/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (aty,DeJean, Kenneth) | |
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W Duplechain. Noble Energy Inc served on 8/12/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (aty,DeJean, Kenneth) | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to C & C Technologies Inc and Noble Energy Inc (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 8/1/2014 to correct file date (Dauterive, C). | |
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against C & C Technologies Inc, Noble Energy Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2580583) filed by David W. Duplechain.(Attorney Kenneth W DeJean added to party David W. Duplechain(pty:pla))(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 8/29/2014 to edit file date . |