Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Marianne B Bowler
Case #: 1:14-cv-13179
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2014
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 6:57 PM EDT
Defendant
John 1-100 Doe
Woburn Police Department 25 Harrison Avenue
Woburn, MA 01801
Represented By
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jerome E. Gately
Woburn Police Department 25 Harrison Avenue
Woburn, MA 01801
Represented By
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mario Pascuccio
Woburn Police Department 25 Harrison Avenue
Woburn, MA 01801
Represented By
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Simonds
Woburn Police Department 25 Harrison Avenue
Woburn, MA 01801
Represented By
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Woburn Police Department
25 Harrison Avenue
Woburn, MA 01801
Represented By
Regina M. Ryan
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pro Se Party John Patrick Devine
4 Warren Avenue Apt. C
Woburn, MA 01801

GPO Sep 30 2016
Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry # 44); Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry # 48); Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry # 52). Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry # 44) is ALLOWED with respect to the section 1983 false arrest claim and municipal liability against the Woburn Police Department and otherwise DENIED. Plaintiff's summary judgment motion (Docket Entry # 52) is DENIED and John Devine, Sr.'s summary judgment motion (Docket Entry # 48) is DENIED as moot because there is no civil conspiracy claim pled against him in the third-party complaint or a state law civil conspiracy claim in the complaint upon which to base a contribution or indemnity claim. (Patton, Christine)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 10, 2017
74 74 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/10 11:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by John 1-100 Doe, Jerome E. Gately, Mario Pascuccio, David Simonds, Woburn Police Department. (Ryan, Regina)
Related: [-]