California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:21-cv-01596
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2021
Terminated:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 02, 2022 12:29 AM PST
Defendant
Duarte Nursery Inc.
Represented By
Gerald E. Brunn
Law Offices Of Brunn & Flynn
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Lucero
Represented By
Thiago Merlini Coelho
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info
Binyamin I. Manoucheri
Wilshire Law Firm, PLC
contact info

GPO Dec 09 2021
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/08/21 STAYING action and VACATING all previously set deadlines and hearings. The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement of this action. If the parties have not been able to informally reach a settlement within 45 days, the parties shall initiate participation in the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP"); no later than 14 days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall jointly file their VDRP Completion Report. CASE STAYED (Benson, A.)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 03, 2022
order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/03 12:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/3/2022: This action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the Joint Stipulated Request for Dismissal, ECF No.10 . Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED, and this case is CLOSED with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
10 10 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/02 3:05 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Christopher Lucero.(Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 09, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 12/09 11:41 AM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/08/21 STAYING action and VACATING all previously set deadlines and hearings. The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement of this action. If the parties have not been able to informally reach a settlement within 45 days, the parties shall initiate participation in the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP"); no later than 14 days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall jointly file their VDRP Completion Report. CASE STAYED (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/17 4:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Duarte Nursery Inc.. (Brunn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/17 4:38 PM
ANSWER by Duarte Nursery Inc..(Brunn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 11/04 2:23 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time For Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Duarte Nursery Inc.. (Brunn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/07 4:44 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER to Complaint by Duarte Nursery Inc.. Attorney Brunn, Gerald E. added. (Brunn, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/16 5:02 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Duarte Nursery Inc. served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Tue 09/07 1:14 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 09/07 12:59 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Duarte Nursery Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago M. Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, California 90010*. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Friday, September 03, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT against Duarte Nursery Inc. by Christopher Lucero. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9802693)(Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet