Original Case: 1:21-cv-00982

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02137
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2021
Terminated:Mar 08, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 3:32 AM EST
Amicus Curiae
Election Commissioners' Association for the State of New York
Represented By
Margaret A. Murphy
Margaret A. Murphy, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Zellner
Represented By
Charles Gerstein
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ralph M. Mohr
Represented By
Charles Gerstein
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Erie County Board of Elections
Represented By
Charles Gerstein
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Jeremy Christopher Toth
Erie County Attorney's Office
contact info
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Erie County Board of Elections
Represented By
Jeremy Christopher Toth
Erie County Attorney's Office
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
India B. Walton
Represented By
Frank Housh II
Law Offices of Frank Housh
contact info
Roberta Kaplan
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
contact info
Joshua Adam Matz
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
contact info
Raymond P. Tolentino
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
contact info
Harmann Singh
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlanda D. Meadors, an individual
Plaintiff
Leonard A. Matarese, an individual
Plaintiff
Jomo D. Akono, an individual
Plaintiff
Kim P. Nixon-Williams
Plaintiff
Florence E. Baugh
Represented By
Bryan L. Sells
The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Carlanda D. Meadors, an individual
Represented By
Bryan L. Sells
The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Leonard A. Matarese, an individual
Represented By
Bryan L. Sells
The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Kim P. Nixon-Williams
Represented By
Bryan L. Sells
The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jomo D. Akono, an individual
Represented By
Bryan L. Sells
The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/09/2022 3:30 AM EST
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. [3168551] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 12:00 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED
2 2 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 09/03/2021, RECEIVED.[3168565] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 12:05 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, district court receipt # 0209-4351369, FILED.[3168569] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 12:06 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3168949] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:55 PM]
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [6], on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED.[3168962] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:01 PM]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3168977] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:08 PM]
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [8], on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED.[3168994] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:13 PM]
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3169000] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:16 PM]
Related: [-]
11 11 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [7], [9], [10], on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED.[3169003] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:18 PM]
Related: [-]
12 12 ATTORNEY, Joshua Matz, [10], in place of attorney Sean E. Cooney, SUBSTITUTED.[3169004] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:19 PM]
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3169010] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:21 PM]
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3169016] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:24 PM]
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3169021] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:25 PM]
Related: [-]
16 16 ATTORNEY, Harmann Singh, Raymond P. Tolentino, Roberta Kaplan for India B. Walton, in case 21-2137 [13], [14], [15], ADDED.[3169028] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:30 PM]
Related: [-]
17 17 30+ pgs MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant India B. Walton, FILED. Service date 09/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3169122] 21-2137 [Entered: 09/07/2021 06:52 PM]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Erie County Board of Elections in 21-2145 FILED. [3169396] 21-2145 21-2137 [Entered: 09/08/2021 10:52 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED