Utah District Court
Judge:Ted Stewart
Referred: Jared C Bennett
Case #: 2:21-cv-00534
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 07, 2022 1:55 AM MST
Defendant
Bradley C. Burton
Represented By
James T. Egan
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Nourin Nahed Abourahma
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Stephen W. Owens
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Defendant
Granger Medical Clinic PC
Represented By
James T. Egan
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Nourin Nahed Abourahma
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Stephen W. Owens
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Defendant
Sean J. Henderson
Represented By
James T. Egan
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Nourin Nahed Abourahma
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Stephen W. Owens
Epperson & Owens PC
contact info
Defendant
IHC Health Services
Represented By
Robert G Wright
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Rafael A. Seminario
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
W. Shane Cohen
W Shane Cohen & Associates PLLC
contact info
Defendant
IHC Health Services Inc.
Represented By
Robert G Wright
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Rafael A. Seminario
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
W. Shane Cohen
W Shane Cohen & Associates PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Scott R. Jacob
Represented By
Jaryl L. Rencher
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Benjamin K. Lusty
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Defendant
David Pennington
Represented By
Jacob W. Nelson
Campbell Williams Ference & Hall
contact info
Derek J. Williams
Campbell Williams Ference & Hall
contact info
John D. Ference
Campbell Williams Ference & Hall
contact info
Defendant
Pennington Medical Center
Represented By
Jacob W. Nelson
Campbell Williams Ference & Hall
contact info
Derek J. Williams
Campbell Williams Ference & Hall
contact info
John D. Ference
Campbell Williams Ference & Hall
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Amanda A. Berndt
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jeffrey E. Nelson
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Valley Obstetrics & Gynecology
Represented By
Jaryl L. Rencher
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Benjamin K. Lusty
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Parada
Represented By
G. Eric Nielson
G Eric Nielson & Associates
contact info
Marianne P. Card
G Eric Nielson & Associates
contact info

GPO Nov 10 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 86 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem ad Litem. Petitioners' representation in this action is now terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/10/2022. (mh)
GPO Feb 06 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- Petitioner's 117 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision is OVERRULED and Plaintiffs' 108 Motion to File Memorandum is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/6/2023. (mh)
GPO Mar 28 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-denying without prejudice63 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying without prejudice66 Motion for Leave to File; re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support for Defendants (1) Sean J. Henderson, D.O.; (2) Bradley C. Burton, PA-C; and (3) Granger Medical Clinic, P.C., 66 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Cross-Claim and Memorandum in Support ; Motions terminated: 66 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Cross-Claim and Memorandum in Support filed by IHC Health Services Inc., IHC Health Services, 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support for Defendants (1) Sean J. Henderson, D.O.; (2) Bradley C. Burton, PA-C; and (3) Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. filed by Sean J. Henderson, Granger Medical Clinic PC, Bradley C. Burton. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/28/23. (jrj)
GPO Nov 06 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 148 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss Party and denying as moot 149 MOTION to Amend/Correct Pleading and Cross-Claim. Sean J. Henderson (D.O.), Bradley C. Burton (PA-C) and Granger Medical Clinic PC terminated. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/6/2023. (mh)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
202 202 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/06 1:52 PM
ORDER granting 201 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for the Pennington Defendants to file their replies in support of their 195 motion to exclude expert opinions re: future care and 196 motion to exclude unreliable causation opinions is extended to May 9, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/6/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
201 201 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/02 4:16 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to196 Joint MOTION to Exclude UNRELIABLE CAUSATION OPINIONS ,195 Joint MOTION to Exclude EXPERT OPINIONS RE: FUTURE CARE filed by Defendants David Pennington, Pennington Medical Center. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Phippen, Chelsey)
Related: [-]