Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Case #: 2:21-cv-04024
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Dec 10, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 07, 2022 5:01 AM EST
Defendant
TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH
Wisler Pearlstine, LLP
contact info
BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Wisler Pearlstine, LLP
contact info
CHRISTINA GALLAGHER
Wisler Pearlstine, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICIA GEERLINGS
Represented By
GARY M. SAMMS
Obermayer Rebbmann Maxwell & Hippell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID GOVERNANTI
AS THE PARENT AND/OR NATURAL GUARDIAN OF SG, A MINOR 111 Sugartown Road
Devon, PA 19333
Represented By
GARY M. SAMMS
Obermayer Rebbmann Maxwell & Hippell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SARAH MARVIN
AS THE PARENT AND/OR NATURAL GUARDIAN OF HA, A MINOR 1451 Russell Road
Paoli, PA 19301
Represented By
GARY M. SAMMS
Obermayer Rebbmann Maxwell & Hippell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW MCLELLAN
AS THE PARENT AND/OR NATURAL GUARDIAN OF HM, A MINOR 4159 Whitehorse Road
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
GARY M. SAMMS
Obermayer Rebbmann Maxwell & Hippell LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 27 2021
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/27/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO Sep 27 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S "PETITION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION" 2 IS DENIED; AND DEFENDANT'S "MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF SHANNON GRADY" 12 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/27/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, December 10, 2021
28 28 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/13 11:28 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/10/21. 12/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/10 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To DISMISSING MATTER AGAINST TREDYFFRIN/EASTTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT(SAMMS, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/07 3:13 PM
ORDER THAT, WITHIN THREE (3) BUSINESS DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS LETTER REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION UNDER RULE 12(B) (ECF NO.24 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/7/21. 12/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
25 25 misc Letter Thu 11/11 10:10 AM
Letter dated November 11, 2021 by TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT. (ELIAS, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
24 24 misc Letter Tue 11/09 4:19 PM
Letter dated November 9, 2021 by TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT. (ELIAS, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/09 8:36 AM
ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 22) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO FOLLOW THE PROCEDURE FOR RULE 12(B) MOTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/8/21.11/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw, )
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss Mon 11/08 3:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(STAMBAUGH, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Monday, September 27, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 09/27 2:29 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S "PETITION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION"2 IS DENIED; AND DEFENDANT'S "MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF SHANNON GRADY"12 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/27/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
20 20 19 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 09/27 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/27/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
19 19 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 09/23 6:24 PM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re18 Transcript - PDF,, 9/23/21 Entered and Copies Emailed. (va, )
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Transcript - PDF Thu 09/23 6:12 PM
TRANSCRIPT of MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING held on 9/14/21, before Judge MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Transcribed By: Michael T. Keating, TK Trnascribers. Redaction Request due 10/13/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2021. (va, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
17 17 10 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/17 4:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Exclude Testimony filed by ALICIA GEERLINGS, DAVID GOVERNANTI, SARAH MARVIN, ANDREW MCLELLAN.(SAMMS, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 2 pgs Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 16, 2021
16 16 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 09/16 9:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Telephone Conference held on 9/15/21 Court Reporter: ESR. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 09/16 9:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. Motion Hearing held on 9/14/21 re2 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendant filed by SARAH MARVIN, ALICIA GEERLINGS, ANDREW MCLELLAN, DAVID GOVERNANTI Court Reporter: ESR. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/15 3:41 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF SHANNON GRADY (ECF NO.12 ) NO LATER THAN FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 5:00 P.M. UPON RECEIPT AND REVIEW OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE, I WILL DECIDE: (1) WHETHER TO HOLD A HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE, AND (2) WHETHER TO ISSUE AN EXPEDITED SCHEDULE FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE SHALL ADDRESS THE FOLLOWING, OUTLINED HEREIN. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/15/21. 9/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/15 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: ON-THE-RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/2021 AT 2:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. ENTERED 9/15/2021 AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sl, )
Related: [-]
12 12 8 pgs motion Exclude Wed 09/15 10:01 AM
MOTION to Exclude Testimony filed by TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT.Certificate of Service.(ELIAS, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 9 pgs Exhibit 4
Monday, September 13, 2021
11 11 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 09/14 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. Telephone Pre-Hearing Conference held on 09/13/2021. (va, )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Hearing Mon 09/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: *NEW COURTROOM ASSIGNMENT* HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR 9/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN Courtroom 17A BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. ENTERED 9/13/2021 AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sl, )
Related: [-]
9 9 22 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/13 1:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendant filed by TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT.(ELIAS, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 22 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 25 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 9 10 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 10 7 pgs Exhibit
Friday, September 10, 2021
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/10 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH R. STAMBAUGH on behalf of TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(STAMBAUGH, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/10 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA GALLAGHER on behalf of TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, CHRISTINA)
Related: [-]
6 6 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 09/10 9:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. Re: An Initial Conference on TRO/PI was held by telephone on 9/9/21. (fdc)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 09/10 8:00 AM
ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/14/21 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 4-B; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/10/21. 9/10/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Hearing Thu 09/09 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/13/2021 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. ENTERED 9/9/2021 AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sl, )
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/09 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS on behalf of TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(ELIAS, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Thu 09/09 12:37 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 09/09 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to TREDYFFRIN/EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/9/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 5 pgs motion Permanent Injunction Wed 09/08 11:33 PM
First MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendant filed by ALICIA GEERLINGS, DAVID GOVERNANTI, SARAH MARVIN, ANDREW MCLELLAN.Brief.(SAMMS, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 2 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 5 14 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 6 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 7 29 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 8 78 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 9 1 pgs Exhibit
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 09/08 11:08 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15391107.), filed by ALICIA GEERLINGS, ANDREW MCLELLAN, DAVID GOVERNANTI, SARAH MARVIN.(SAMMS, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet