Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:21-cv-03981
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2021
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 27, 2022 3:36 AM EST
Defendant
ROBERT J. KRANDEL
Represented By
MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Admin Office Of Pa Courts
contact info
Defendant
MEG SNEAD
Defendant
WAYNE AND JANET PREWITT
Represented By
ANDREW C. ECKERT
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
PATRICK J. BRENNAN
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
Defendant
ARVIL PREWITT
Represented By
ANDREW C. ECKERT
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
PATRICK J. BRENNAN
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
Defendant
POTTS, SCHOEMAKER AND GROSSMAN, L.L.C.
Represented By
PAUL C. TROY
Kane Pugh Knoell And Driscoll, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
JULIE M. POTTS
Represented By
PAUL C. TROY
Kane Pugh Knoell And Driscoll, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
VANESSA PIERRE
Defendant
BRIAN J. MCCABE
Defendant
RICHARD E. LOMBARDI
Represented By
MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Admin Office Of Pa Courts
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT A. LISGAR
Represented By
SCOTT A. LISGAR
Keller, Lisgar And Williams
contact info
Defendant
KELLER, LISGAR, & WILLIAMS, L.L.P.
Represented By
SCOTT A. LISGAR
Keller, Lisgar And Williams
contact info
Defendant
DORA L. KASSEL
Represented By
MARK A. SERENI
Diorio & Sereni, LLP
contact info
Defendant
KANE, PUGH, KNOELL, TROY & KRAMER, L.L.P.
Represented By
PAUL C. TROY
Kane Pugh Knoell And Driscoll, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1
Defendant
CRAIG B. HUFFMAN
Defendant
SANDRA GARRISON
Defendant
ECKELL, SPARKS, LEVY, AUERBACH, MONTE, SLOANE, MATTHEWS AND AUSLANDER, P.C.
Defendant
PAUL C. TROY
Represented By
PAUL C. TROY
Kane Pugh Knoell And Driscoll, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
LARISSA C. CONNELLY
Represented By
ANDREW C. ECKERT
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
PATRICK J. BRENNAN
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
Defendant
ANNA MARIE CIARDI
Represented By
MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Admin Office Of Pa Courts
contact info
Defendant
TRACY L. CHRISTMAN
Represented By
MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS
Admin Office Of Pa Courts
contact info
Plaintiff
O.W.C.
Represented By
THOMAS P. CONNELLY, JR.
Thomas Connelly, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
T.P.C., III
Represented By
THOMAS P. CONNELLY, JR.
Thomas Connelly, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
E.M.C.
Represented By
THOMAS P. CONNELLY, JR.
Thomas Connelly, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS P. CONNELLY, JR.
23 PETSCH ROAD
READING, PA 19606
Represented By
THOMAS P. CONNELLY, JR.
Thomas Connelly, Esq.
contact info
Unrepresented Party
ECKELL, SPARKS, LEVY, AUERBACH, MONTE, SLOANE, MATTHEWS AND AUSLANDER, P.C.
113 EAST EVANS STREET MATLACK BUILDING, SUITE 3-1
WEST CHESTER, PA 19380
Unrepresented Party
SANDRA GARRISON
20 SOUTH 69TH STREET, 4TH FLOOR
UPPER DARBY, PA 19082
Unrepresented Party
CRAIG B. HUFFMAN
113 E. Evans St. MATLACK BUILDING, SUITE D-1
West Chester, PA 19380
Unrepresented Party
BRIAN J. MCCABE
PSP TROOP J. 2 MOXLEY RD.
AVONDALE, PA 19311
Unrepresented Party
VANESSA PIERRE
Pa. D.H.S. Baldwin Tower, Suite 102 S. 1510 Chester Pike
Eddystone, PA 19022
Unrepresented Party
MEG SNEAD
625 FORSTER STREET
HARRISBURG, PA 17120
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
SCHOENFELD, SURKIN, CHUPEIN & DEMIS, P.C.
Terminated: 02/17/2022
Represented By
JOSH J.T. BYRNE
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Defendant
LYN B. SCHOENFELD
Terminated: 02/17/2022
Represented By
JOSH J.T. BYRNE
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
100 100 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/23 2:38 PM
ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/23/22. 8/23/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
99 99 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/18 6:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To ALL DEFENDANTS(CONNELLY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]