Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:21-bk-41280
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Oct 01, 2021
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024

Debtor
M&S Sales & Marketing LLC
121 W Waters Edge Way
Oak Point, TX 75068-3304
Represented By
Jeff Carruth
Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michelle Chow
6318 E. Lovers Lane
Dallas, TX 75214
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 09/09/2021 12:03 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
crditcrd none Wed 09/08 2:48 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 21-41280 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12173012, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 09/08 2:37 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Without Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by M&S Sales & Marketing LLC, Document Due 09/15/2021.(Carruth, Jeff)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Affidavit Wed 09/08 2:45 AM
Affidavit Filed by M&S Sales & Marketing LLC (Carruth, Jeff)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 09/08 2:46 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by M&S Sales & Marketing LLC (Carruth, Jeff)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Wed 09/08 11:47 PM
341(a)
Related: [-]