In Re: Purdue Pharma L.P.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 7:21-cv-07532 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2021 |
Debtor
Purdue Pharma L.P.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 08, 2022 3:40 AM EST |
Amicus
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ad Hoc Committee of NAS Children
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
State of Maryland
Office of the Attorney General 200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Represented By
|
Appellant
The State of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Ad Hoc Group of Individual Victims of Purdue Pharma, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
The Raymond Sackler Family
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Mortimer-side Initial Covered Sackler Persons
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Multi-State Governmental Entities Group
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
U.S. Trustee William K. Harrington
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
Dr. William Tong
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
The State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
The Peter Ballantyne Cree Nation
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
The District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
The City of Grande Prairie
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
State of Oregon
Oregon Department of Justice, Natural Resources Section 1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
State Of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
People of The State of California
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellant
Peter F. Neronha
|
|
Consolidated Appellant
Ellen Isaacs
|
|
Consolidated Appellant
Richard Ecke
18 Meadowlark Rd
West Simsbury, CT 06092 |
|
Consolidated Appellant
Maria Ecke
8 Glenbrook Dr
West Simsbury, CT 06092 |
|
Consolidated Appellant
Andrew Ecke
18 Meadowlark Rd
West Simsbury, CT 06092 |
|
Consolidated Appellant
Ronald Bass
450 Little Place Apt. 53
N. Plainfield, NJ 07060 |
|
Consolidated Appellee
Raymond Sackler Family/Side B of the Sackler Family
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellee
Mortimer Sackler Family/Side A of the Sackler Family
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Appellee
Mortimer Sackler Family
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Governmental and Other Contingent Litigation Claimants
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 6:00 AM EDT |
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Tue 10/24 8:53 AM
Appeal Record Sent to SCUS (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for361 Notice (Other) USCA Case Number 22-110, 22-113, 22-115, 22-116, 22-117, 22-119, 22-121, 22-299, 22-203. SCUS Case Number 23-0124 , were transmitted to the Supreme Court of the United States. (tp) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
361 | 361
1
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/19 1:33 PM
United States Supreme Court Record Request as to Trevor Murray. SCOTUS Case Number 23-124; USCA Case Numbers: 22-110, 22-113, 22-115, 22-116, 22-117, 22-119, 22-121, 22-299, 22-203.(nd) |