Maine District Court
Judge:George Z Singal
Referred: Karen Frink Wolf
Case #: 1:21-cv-00260
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Terminated:Jul 22, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 3:57 AM EST
Defaulted Party
DAMIAN MEJIA
Defaulted Party
BRIANNA MEJIA-BOUCHARD
Defendant
WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By
RYAN P. DUMAIS
Eaton Peabody
contact info
TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Defendant
WORCESTER RESOURCES INC
Represented By
RYAN P. DUMAIS
Eaton Peabody
contact info
TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Defendant
WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY
Represented By
RYAN P. DUMAIS
Eaton Peabody
contact info
TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD RIVERA
Represented By
PETER G. MANCUSO
Andrew Schmidt Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WALESCA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By
PETER G. MANCUSO
Andrew Schmidt Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 29, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/29 11:49 AM
AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/22 11:23 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/21 12:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Settlement Conference held. Settlement achieved. (Court Reporter: Cathy Ford) (jwr)
Related: [-]
order Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement Tue 06/21 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: A settlement conference having been held this date and counsel reporting that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 7/21/2022. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/16 2:06 PM
ORDER setting Video Settlement Conference for 6/21/2022 08:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON, In Camera Settlement Papers due by 6/14/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
18 18 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 04/28 2:10 PM
ORDER granting without objection17 Motion to Stay. GRANTED WITHOUT OBJECTION. This matter shall be stayed as outlined in the Motion to allow for a judicial settlement conference on a to-be-determined date after June 1, 2022. Counsel shall filed a status update with the Court by no later than August 5, 2022, unless a notice of settlement is docketed prior to that date. SO ORDERED. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/28 2:11 PM
Set Deadlines per Order No. 18: Status Report (if applicable) due by 8/5/2022. (lrt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
17 17 motion Stay Tue 04/26 3:46 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay and Request for Judicial Settlement Conference by WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY Responses due by 5/17/2022. (DUMAIS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/04 1:57 PM
Case REFERRAL Reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
16 16 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Tue 03/22 2:41 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY. (DUMAIS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion to Amend Tue 03/22 1:46 PM
ORDER granting without objection14 Motion to Amend Answer. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED ANSWER Document as a standalone entry on the docket. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrt)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Amend Tue 03/22 12:11 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend Affirmative Defenses and Answer to First Amended Complaint by WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY Responses due by 4/12/2022.(DUMAIS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Affirmative Defenses and Answer to First Amended Complaint
Monday, January 10, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/10 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN P. DUMAIS on behalf of WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY (DUMAIS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/04 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/31/2022. Motions due by 6/14/2022. Ready for Trial on 8/2/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 01/04 10:06 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to DAMIAN MEJIA, BRIANNA MEJIA-BOUCHARD By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Tully. (lrt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
10 10 motion Default Mon 01/03 4:29 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by RICHARD RIVERA, WALESCA RODRIGUEZ Responses due by 1/24/2022.(MANCUSO, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Friday, December 03, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/03 8:36 AM
Set Deadlines - Defendant Damian Mejia and Briana Mejia-Bouchard's answers were due by 12/1/2021 and as of this date, no answer or responsive pleading has been filed.: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 1/3/2022. (lrt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 12/02 4:25 PM
Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY.(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/29 1:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALESCA RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RIVERA. WORCESTER RESOURCES INC served on 11/10/2021. (MANCUSO, PETER)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/29 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALESCA RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RIVERA. DAMIAN MEJIA served on 11/10/2021. (MANCUSO, PETER)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/29 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALESCA RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RIVERA. BRIANNA MEJIA-BOUCHARD served on 11/10/2021. (MANCUSO, PETER)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 11/29 1:57 PM
Set Answer Deadline for WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, DAMIAN MEJIA, and BRIANNA MEJIA-BOUCHARD per Summons's Returned Executed filed on 11/29/2021: Answers due by 12/1/2021. (lrt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/20 1:47 PM
Summons Issued as to DAMIAN MEJIA, BRIANNA MEJIA-BOUCHARD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (lrt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Damian Mejia Summons
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/20 9:23 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by WALESCA RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RIVERA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/18/2022)(MANCUSO, PETER)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Mon 09/13 11:32 AM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2547398.), filed by WALESCA RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RIVERA.(MANCUSO, PETER)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/10 12:46 PM
Summons Issued as to WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Worcester Resources, Inc summons summons,
Att: 2 Worcester Wreath Company summons
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/10 12:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/10 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against WORCESTER HOLDINGS LLC, WORCESTER RESOURCES INC, WORCESTER WREATH COMPANY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by WALESCA RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RIVERA. (Service of Process Deadline 12/9/2021) Fee due by 9/13/2021.(bfa)
Related: [-]