North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Case #: 5:21-cv-00363
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
Christopher Anthony Conrad
Represented By
Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Hanna & Sullivan, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Colleen L. Byers
Plaintiff
Scott P Guttenberger
Represented By
Gregory D. Whitaker
Parton Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, September 29, 2022
34 34 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/29 2:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Scott P Guttenberger Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 09/28 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding33 Stipulation of Dismissal. Attorneys Austin A. Backus and D. Stuart Punger's names appear in the signature block, but have not entered an appearance in this case yet. Counsel with appearances in this case are directed to refile the document, bearing only the signatures of counsel with proper appearances. Alternatively, attorneys Backus and Punger may file an appearance to remedy the above-noted deficiency. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/27 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Scott P Guttenberger Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 09/27 12:16 PM
ORDER denying (without prejudice) as moot 14 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/27/2022. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 09/27 10:34 AM
Motions No Longer Referred:29 First MOTION for Protective Order ,14 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 09/27 10:35 AM
Motions Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding29 First MOTION for Protective Order ,14 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
30 30 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/29 12:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Scott P Guttenberger Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
Monday, August 08, 2022
29 29 3 pgs motion Protective Order Mon 08/08 2:06 PM
Amended MOTION for Protective Order filed by Scott P Guttenberger. Related [+] Modified on 8/8/2022 to clarify document description in docket text (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-] dding, David
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Protective Order
utility Motion Submitted Mon 08/08 2:47 PM
Motion Submitted to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding29 First MOTION for Protective Order. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 08/01 3:13 PM
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding28 Motion for Protective Order. The proposed order should have been filed as an attachment to the motion, not as a single document. Additionally, the proposed protective order does not include certain required language with respect to the filing of sealed material in the attached proposed protective order - see CM/ECF Policy Manual, § V.I.4 ("All proposed protective orders submitted to the court must contain the language in Section V.G.1(a)(i) through (iv)"). See also Local Civil Rule 79.2. Counsel is directed to refile the motion and a proposed protective order (as an attachment). (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 07/25 12:36 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding28 Motion for Protective Order. The proposed order should have been filed as an attachment to the motion, not as a single document. Additionally, the proposed protective order does not include certain required language with respect to the filing of sealed material in the attached proposed protective order - see CM/ECF Policy Manual, § V.I.4 ("All proposed protective orders submitted to the court must contain the language in Section V.G.1(a)(i) through (iv)"). See also Local Civil Rule 79.2. Counsel is directed to refile the motion and a proposed protective order (as an attachment). (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
28 28 8 pgs motion Protective Order Fri 07/22 1:21 PM
First MOTION for Protective Order filed by Scott P Guttenberger. Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
Thursday, June 09, 2022
utility Motion Submitted Thu 06/09 2:54 PM
Motion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding14 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks . (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion No Longer Submitted Thu 06/09 4:16 PM
Motion No Longer Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers, II: regarding14 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks . (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred Thu 06/09 4:17 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding14 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks . (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
27 27 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/01 1:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 6/1/2022. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
26 26 discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Tue 05/17 9:06 AM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 05/17 10:09 AM
Document Referred:26 Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/07 11:16 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by David G. Redding on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
utility Remark Tue 03/29 1:47 PM
Document Referred:24 Status Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 03/28 11:20 AM
STATUS REPORT by Christopher Anthony Conrad (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/18 7:24 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ormond Drew Grice, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Grice, Ormond)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/09 3:37 PM
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory D. Whitaker terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 3/9/2022. (Copy of order sent to Corey Parton, Parton Law, PLLC, 122 N. McDowell St., Charlotte, NC 28204 and Scott P Guttenberger, #174 246000 S. Tamiami, Trail, Suite 212, Bonita Springs, Florida via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/02 1:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
20 20 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/02 1:39 PM
ORDER regarding 19 Status Report filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. Counsel for defendant is ORDERED to file a status report no later than March 28, 2022, regarding plaintiff's representation by counsel. Additionally, the court suspends all actions in this case and stays the case until March 28, 2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 3/2/2022. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 03/02 2:13 PM
Motion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
utility Remark Mon 02/28 9:48 AM
Document Referred:19 Status Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 02/25 4:30 PM
STATUS REPORT by Christopher Anthony Conrad (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 02/07 8:23 AM
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. For good cause shown by the reasons stated in the motion this court suspends all actions in this case and stays the case for 21 days. Counsel for the defendant is ORDERED to file a status report with the court no later than February 25, 2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 2/4/2022. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
17 17 motion Stay Thu 02/03 1:29 PM
MOTION to Stay Due to Passing of Counsel filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order
utility Motion Referred Thu 02/03 2:36 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding17 MOTION to Stay Due to Passing of Counsel . (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
16 16 notice Notice-other Mon 01/31 9:36 AM
Notice filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad Change of firm name and email address . (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 01/31 2:12 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:16 Notice. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Copy of notice sent to Andrew L. Fitzgerald, Fitzgerald Hanna & Sullivan, PLLC, 119 Brookstown Ave., Suite 402, Winston Salem, NC 27101 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order Mon 01/31 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding14 Motion to Compel. Counsel's motion fails to comply with the judge's practice preferences as it relates to prior consultation with the opposing party and the views of opposing party within the motion. Counsel is directed to file a supplement in accordance with Chief Judge Myers preferences containing the defendant's efforts to confer with the plaintiff and the plaintiff's position on the relief requested. Additionally, at the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
15 15 4 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 01/24 3:13 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding14 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs motion Compel Mon 01/24 3:12 PM
MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena to TapClicks filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit TapClicks subpoena with return from process server,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Fitzgerald
Friday, January 14, 2022
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/14 3:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/14/2022. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Tue 01/11 2:58 PM
ORDER Appointing Colleen L. Byers as Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/11/2022. (Copy of order sent to Colleen L. Byers, COLLEEN BYERS MEDIATION, LLC, 2806 Reynolda Road, Suite 211, Winston Salem, NC 27106 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Selection of Mediator Tue 01/11 12:14 PM
Selection of Colleen Byers as mediator filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
utility Remark Mon 01/10 9:15 AM
Document Referred:10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
10 10 discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Fri 01/07 5:16 PM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
9 9 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Mon 12/20 9:29 AM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/20/2021. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/17 2:27 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
7 7 2 pgs misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 12/08 8:04 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Christopher Anthony Conrad (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
utility Case Selected for Mediation Tue 12/07 11:31 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Tue 12/07 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Christopher Anthony Conrad. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/06 12:35 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew L. Fitzgerald on behalf of Christopher Anthony Conrad. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer Mon 09/27 3:17 PM
DISREGARD ENTRY - ENTERED IN WRONG CASE Case transferred in from Eastern Division Division on 9/27/2021; former case number 4:21-cv-140-D. (Waddell, K.) Modified on 9/27/2021 (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 09/13 10:11 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Scott P Guttenberger (Whitaker, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/13 10:08 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory D. Whitaker on behalf of Scott P Guttenberger. (Whitaker, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/13 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Christopher Anthony Conrad ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6225237.), filed by Scott P Guttenberger. (Whitaker, Gregory) Modified on 9/13/2021 to identify exhibits (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - Rob Account bio information,
Att: 2 43 pgs Exhibit 2 - Twitter posts
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/13 8:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Christopher Anthony Conrad. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 09/13 8:14 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. Counsel is directed to refile because the attachments/exhibits (pages 31-75) should be filed as separate pdfs attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 09/13 8:26 AM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Mon 09/13 8:27 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Scott P Guttenberger. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 09/13 8:47 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the proposed summons ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No other action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 09/13 1:53 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:3 Complaint. Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). The case administrator has modified the docket text so no further action is required by counsel at this time. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
1 1 75 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/10 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Christopher Anthony Conrad ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6225237.), filed by Scott P Guttenberger. (Whitaker, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons