Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:21-cv-01292
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 4:51 AM EST
Defendant
Artesian Water Company, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
George Temple
Represented By
William D. Fletcher, Jr.
Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A.
contact info
Gary E. Junge
Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, September 29, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/29 3:55 PM
SO ORDERED Granting25 Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2022. (nms)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/29 2:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by George Temple. (Fletcher, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
24 24 discov Notice of Service Tue 07/19 9:05 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and documents bates range D000001-D0000934 filed by Artesian Water Company, Inc..(Kinkus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
23 23 discov Notice of Service Tue 05/17 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and Plaintiff First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant filed by George Temple.(Fletcher, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
22 22 discov Notice of Service Wed 04/27 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents filed by George Temple.(Fletcher, William)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Notice of Service Wed 04/27 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by George Temple.(Fletcher, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
utility Case No Longer Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only Wed 04/13 2:06 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Hall for the purpose of exploring ADR. Please see the Court's Standing Order No. 2022-2 dated March 14, 2022. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
20 20 order Order Cancelling Deadline Fri 03/11 9:58 AM
ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's[LINK:March 3, 2022 Announcement] that aside from a few exceptional cases, all referrals to Magistrate Judges for alternative dispute resolution will be vacated, and all currently scheduled mediations will be cancelled, IT IS ORDERED THAT the Status ADR Teleconference scheduled for 4/25/2022 is hereby CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/11/2022. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
19 19 discov Notice of Service Wed 02/09 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff and Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff filed by Artesian Water Company, Inc..(Kinkus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
18 18 order Order Setting Mediation Conferences Mon 02/07 11:10 AM
ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Status Telephone Conference is scheduled for April 25, 2022 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time before Judge Jennifer L. Hall to discuss ADR. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to chambers by dialing (302) 252-2576. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/7/2022. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
17 17 order SO ORDERED Mon 12/20 12:13 PM
SO ORDERED, Granting16 Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2021. (nms)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Mon 12/20 10:00 AM
PROPSOED Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order, by Artesian Water Company, Inc.. (Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 12/20/2021 (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
15 15 discov Notice of Service Mon 12/13 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) filed by Artesian Water Company, Inc..(Kinkus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Conferences Mon 12/13 8:48 AM
ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is scheduled for February 7, 2022 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time before Judge Jennifer L. Hall to discuss ADR. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to chambers. (*See Order for details). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/13/2021. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
13 13 order Oral Order 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 12/08 11:31 AM
ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for 12/10/2021, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/8/2021. (nms)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order - General Wed 12/08 11:28 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 10/6/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/17/2023, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Jury Trial is set to start 3/27/2023, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/8/2021. (nms)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order Wed 12/08 9:57 AM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by George Temple. (Junge, Gary) Modified on 12/8/2021 (nms)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only Wed 12/08 11:37 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at[LINK:https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf] (Taylor, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Tue 11/09 11:55 AM
Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/10/2021, at 9:00 AM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/9/2021. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 11/08 2:58 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Artesian Resources Corporation for Artesian Water Company, Inc. filed by Artesian Water Company, Inc.. (Russell, Lauren)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/08 2:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Artesian Water Company, Inc..(Russell, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 09/27 3:56 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or respond to Complaint to November 8, 2021 - filed by Artesian Water Company, Inc.. (Kinkus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 09/27 4:27 PM
SO ORDERED, re7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or respond to Complaint to November 8, 2021 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Artesian Water Company, Inc. answer due 11/8/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/27/2021. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/22 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Kinkus on behalf of Artesian Water Company, Inc. (Kinkus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/22 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of Artesian Water Company, Inc. (Russell, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/21 11:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Temple. Artesian Water Company, Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Fletcher, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/15 1:00 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/10 4:09 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Artesian Water Company, Inc. on 9/10/2021. (twk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 09/10 4:08 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/10 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Artesian Water Company, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3696604.) - filed by George Temple.(twk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet