Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:21-cv-03758
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Re-opened:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 4:07 AM EST
Defendant
The Paradies Shops, LLC
Represented By
Peter Nathaniel Hall
Holland & Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Ramirez
Represented By
Ryan D. Maxey
Morgan & Morgan, P.A. -T.Fl
contact info
Dylan Artell Bess
Morgan & Morgan, Pllc - Atl
contact info
John A. Yanchunis
Morgan & Morgan, P.A. -T.Fl
contact info
Ryan D Maxey
Morgan & Morgan, P.A. -T.Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
51 51 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 04/14 4:28 PM
ORDER: After reviewing48 Plaintiff's unopposed request for preliminary approval, this Court GRANTS the Motion and preliminarily concludes that the proposed Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate. The Court DENIES as MOOT the Plaintiff's originally-filed Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Doc.43 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT The Court shall hold a Final Approval Hearing on July 24, 2025, at 11:00am, in Courtroom No. 1708, Richard B. Russell Federal Building & United States Courthouse, 2211 United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, GA. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 04/14/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 4:29 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ajw)
Related: [-]