Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00293
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 11, 2021 3:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Jacob Montgomery Gibson (1)
Represented By
Dennis Craig O'Brien
Law Office Of Dennis C O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul Rhinehart Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2022 9:05 AM EST
Thursday, August 12, 2021
NOTICE OF SENTENCING (by docket entry only) as to Jacob Montgomery Gibson. Sentencing is set for 11/16/2021 at 2:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. (bgt)
Related: [-]
1 1 INFORMATION with Forfeiture Provision as to Jacob Montgomery Gibson (1) count(s) 1. (tmf)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jacob Montgomery Gibson (tmf)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jacob Montgomery Gibson. ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA of GUILTY by Jacob Montgomery Gibson (1) as to Count 1. Initial Appearance and Plea to Information Hearing held. Defendant arraigned and pled guilty, pursuant to a plea agreement, to the sole count of the criminal information and the Court adjudged Defendant guilty. Defendant remains in the custody of the United States Marshals Service. (Court Reporter Jana B. Colter) (tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Guilty Plea and Plea Agreement