New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:21-cv-16790
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2021
Terminated:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 10, 2022 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
EMBARK BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Defendant
JANE DOE 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
ABC CORP 1-10
Defendant
CHANGE ACADEMY LAKE OF OZARKS
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
ABIGAIL LIEBOWITZ
Represented By
FREDERICK RICHARD DUNNE, III
Dunne, Dunne & Cohen, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
IRA LIEBOWITZ
Represented By
FREDERICK RICHARD DUNNE, III
Dunne, Dunne & Cohen, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 03, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (4m, 41.1) Thu 02/03 5:18 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). The above captioned action be and is hereby dismissed, as to all defendant(s), pursuant to F. R. Civ. P. 4(m), without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/3/2022. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Tue 01/11 1:50 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 4(m). This action will be dismissed on JANUARY 24, 2022, for failure to effect service of the summons and complaint within 90 days of the filing of the complaint, unless Plaintiff establishes that proper service was effected within said 90 days, by filing proof of service with the Clerk of the Court before the return date of this notice, etc. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/17 10:14 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHANGE ACADEMY LAKE OF OZARKS, EMBARK BEHAVIORAL HEALTH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Mon 09/13 9:03 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/13 2:05 PM
Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Mon 09/13 2:06 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 11, 2021
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 09/11 10:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12791785) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ABIGAIL LIEBOWITZ, N. LIEBOWITZ, IRA LIEBOWITZ.(DUNNE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]