South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 2:21-cv-02920
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA
Represented By
Shawn Daughtridge Wallace
Clement Rivers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Represented By
Shawn Daughtridge Wallace
Clement Rivers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ted Sigmon
Represented By
James L Ward, Jr
Mcgowan Hood And Felder LLC
contact info
Holly Christine Blackwell
Nye Stirling Hale And Miller LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 26, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/26 4:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10. (Ramia, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/08 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Ramia on behalf of Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10 (Ramia, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/10 11:57 AM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 1/7/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/7/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/13/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/14/2022, Discovery due by 11/4/2022, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/21/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 12/30/2022, ADR Statement due by 11/29/2022, Mediation Due by 12/29/2022. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 01/10/2022. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
14 14 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 01/07 11:18 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ted Sigmon.(Ward, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 01/07 10:22 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10.(Wallace, Shawn)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Fri 01/07 10:22 AM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10.(Wallace, Shawn)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Rule 26(f) Report Fri 01/07 10:21 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10.(Wallace, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/08 3:50 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/08/2021.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Tue 12/07 12:01 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holly Christine Blackwell ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10222124) by Ted Sigmon. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ward, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/04 11:05 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDERRule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/10/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/7/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 1/7/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/11/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/14/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/15/2022, Discovery due by 8/6/2022, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 8/23/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 10/1/2022, ADR Statement due by 8/31/2022, Mediation Due by 9/30/2022. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/03/2021. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
misc Case Reassigned CV Fri 10/29 8:06 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable David C Norton. Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
6 6 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 10/27 3:41 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10.(Wallace, Shawn)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/27 3:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Charleston Gastroenterology Specialists PA, Does 1-10.(Wallace, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 09/13 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 09/13 2:32 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ted Sigmon.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/13 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10065976.), filed by Ted Sigmon. Service due by 12/9/2021(sshe, )
Related: [-]