Original Case: 1:18-cv-05587

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02664
Typecivil / us
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2021
Terminated:Nov 04, 2021
Last checked: Friday Nov 05, 2021 3:30 AM CDT
Appellee
KEVIN B. DUFF
Represented By
Michael Rachlis
RACHLIS, DUFF, ADLER & PEEL LLC
contact info
Defendant
EQUITYBUILD, INC.
Represented By
Jonathan Gardner
LABATON SUCHAROW LLP
contact info
Defendant
EQUITYBUILD FINANCE, LLC
Defendant
SHAUN D. COHEN
Represented By
Shaun D. Cohen
contact info
Defendant
JEROME H. COHEN
Represented By
Jerome H. Cohen
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
VENTUS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
Saskia N. Bryan
LATIMER LEVAY FYOCK LLC
contact info
Robert S. Minetz
LATIMER LEVAY FYOCK LLC
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
VENTUS MERRILL, LLC
Represented By
Saskia N. Bryan
LATIMER LEVAY FYOCK LLC
contact info
Robert S. Minetz
LATIMER LEVAY FYOCK LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By
Michael Andrew Conley
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info
Benjamin J. Hanauer
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/05/2021 3:27 AM CDT
Monday, September 13, 2021
1 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Ventus Holdings, LLC and Ventus Merrill, LLC by 09/17/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 09/27/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/25/2021 for Ventus Holdings, LLC and Ventus Merrill, LLC. [1] [7185177] 21-2664 (AG) [Entered: 09/13/2021 11:44 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 147 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court