Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:21-cv-01049
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2021
Terminated:Sep 22, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Mar 13, 2022 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Nader Hasan
Defendant
Victory Coalition Services LLC
Defendant
Travis Tull
Defendant
Tate Bywater Law Firm
Defendant
James R Tate
Defendant
Paul Mickelsen
Defendant
Daniel Krisky
Defendant
Caitlin Higgins
Defendant
Robert Fredericks
Defendant
Jonathan Fahey
Defendant
Douglas E. Bywater
Defendant
Martha Boneta
Defendant
Kathryn Bigus
Defendant
Ben Ader
Plaintiff
Patrick Hughes
360 Herndon Parkway Suite 1400
Herndon, VA 20170


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/24 1:33 PM
ORDER granting8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Patrick Hughes. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/22/2021. (see Order for further details) (swil) (c/s to pro se plaintiff)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 09/20 1:33 PM
Dismissal of Complaint by Nonsuit by Patrick Hughes (swil)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 09/20 10:45 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as a separate docket entry within seven (7) days of this order and shall serve the amended complaint on defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/20/2021. (see Order for further details. (swil) (c/s to pro se Plaintiff)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/17 11:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Hughes Ben Ader served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Kathryn Bigus served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Martha Boneta served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Douglas E. Bywater served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Jonathan Fahey served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Robert Fredericks served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Nader Hasan served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Caitlin Higgins served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Daniel Krisky served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Paul Mickelsen served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; James R Tate served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Tate Bywater Law Firm served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Travis Tull served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Victory Coalition Services LLC served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 (swil)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/17 11:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Patrick Hughes.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Wed 09/15 4:12 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/15/2021. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
3 3 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Tue 09/14 1:44 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Patrick Hughes. (swil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/14 1:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Ben Ader, Kathryn Bigus, Martha Boneta, Douglas E. Bywater, Jonathan Fahey, Robert Fredericks, Nader Hasan, Caitlin Higgins, Daniel Krisky, Paul Mickelsen, James R Tate, Tate Bywater Law Firm, Travis Tull, Victory Coalition Services LLC. (swil)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/14 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Ben Ader, Kathryn Bigus, Martha Boneta, Douglas E. Bywater, Jonathan Fahey, Robert Fredericks, Nader Hasan, Caitlin Higgins, Daniel Krisky, Paul Mickelsen, James R Tate, Tate Bywater Law Firm, Travis Tull, Victory Coalition Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 14683091740.), filed by Patrick Hughes.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment,
Att: 3 Receipt