Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:21-cv-01568
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2021
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Case in other court:Ninth Circuit, 22-15518
Last checked: Sunday Mar 13, 2022 3:23 AM MST
Defendant
Mathew C Blum
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Rochelle Walensky
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Elissa Fudim
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Rights (pennsylvania Ave.)
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
Defendant
John M Tenaglia
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
L Eric Patterson
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
James M Murray
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey A Koses
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Karla S Jackson
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Defendant
Lesley A Field
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Deanne Criswell
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Zients
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Shalanda Young
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Office of Management and Budget
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Troy Miller
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Christopher M Lynch
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Fed Programs Branch
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Tae Johnson
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Christopher M Lynch
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Fed Programs Branch
contact info
Elissa Fudim
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Rights (pennsylvania Ave.)
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Elissa Fudim
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Rights (pennsylvania Ave.)
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
General Services Administration
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Robin Carnahan
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Joseph R Biden
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Christopher M Lynch
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Fed Programs Branch
contact info
Elissa Fudim
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Rights (pennsylvania Ave.)
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Christopher M Lynch
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Fed Programs Branch
contact info
Elissa Fudim
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Rights (pennsylvania Ave.)
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Kiran Ahuja
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Robert Charles Merritt
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Christopher M Lynch
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Fed Programs Branch
contact info
Elissa Fudim
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Rights (pennsylvania Ave.)
contact info
Joseph John DeMott
Us Dept Of Justice - Civil Division Federal Programs Branch
contact info
Kevin Wynosky
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Brnovich
Represented By
Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Drew Curtis Ensign
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
James Kenneth Rogers
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Arizona, State of
Represented By
Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Drew Curtis Ensign
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
James Kenneth Rogers
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Phoenix, City of
Terminated: 02/10/2022
Represented By
Hayleigh Susan Crawford
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Joshua David R Bendor
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Al Reble
Terminated: 02/10/2022
Represented By
Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Wilenchik & Bartness PC
contact info
John Douglas Wilenchik
Wilenchik & Bartness PC
contact info
Davis P Bauer
Wilenchik & Bartness PC
contact info
Plaintiff
United Phoenix Firefighters Association Local 493
Terminated: 02/10/2022
Represented By
Eric Reginald Wilson
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Michael Napier
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Cassidy Layne Bacon
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Phoenix Law Enforcement Association
Terminated: 02/10/2022
Represented By
Eric Reginald Wilson
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Michael Napier
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Cassidy Layne Bacon
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info

GPO Jan 27 2022
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate Claims and Consolidate Trial on the Merits (Doc. 73). FURTHER ORDERED granting in part, and denying in part, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 72), as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that consistent with the terms of this Order, Plaintiffs the State of Arizona and Arizona Attorney General Mark Brnovich shall submit a proposed form of injunction by no later than Tuesday, February 1, 2022. The proposed form of injunction shall detail the individuals and entities that are enjoined, the capacity in which they are enjoined, and the precise activities they are enjoined from engaging in. The proposed injunction must be specific enough to give Defendants notice as to exactly what comes within its scope. FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants may submit objections to Plaintiffs' proposed form of injunction by no later than Monday, February 7, 2022. The objections shall not repeat merits arguments and shall be limited to arguments that Plaintiffs' proposed form of injunction is inconsistent with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/27/22. (SJF)
GPO Feb 10 2022
PERMANENT INJUNCTION - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2201 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 57, the Court declares that the vaccination requirement for federal contractors and subcontractors established pursuant to Executive Order 14042 (the "Contractor Mandate") exceeds the scope of the President's authority under the Federal Property and Administrative Services Act (the "Procurement Act"), 40 U.S.C. § 101 et seq. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment, with prejudice, in favor of Plaintiffs the State of Arizona and Arizona Attorney General Mark Brnovich, and against Federal Defendants, on Count I of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Counts III and IV, as asserted by Plaintiffs the State of Arizona and Arizona Attorney General Mark Brnovich, are dismissed as nonjusticiable, insofar as they seek tochallenge the vaccination requirement for federal employees established pursuant toExecutive Order 14043 (the Employee Mandate). There being no just reason for delay,the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment, without prejudice, against Plaintiffs the State of Arizona and Arizona Attorney General Mark Brnovich, and in favor of Federal Defendants, on Counts III and IV of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, insofar as those claims challenge the Employee Mandate. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment, with prejudice, against Plaintiffs the State of Arizona and Arizona Attorney General Mark Brnovich, and in favor of Federal Defendants, on Counts II, III, IV, V, VI, VII, and VIII of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, insofar as those claims challenge the Contractor Mandate. All claims asserted by Plaintiff Al Reble are dismissed as nonjusticiable. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment, without prejudice, against Plaintiff Reble, and to dismiss him from this action. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment, with prejudice, against Plaintiffs the Phoenix Law Enforcement Association and United Phoenix Firefighters Association Local 493, and in favor of Defendant the City of Phoenix, on Counts I, IV, and VI of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is further directed to dismiss Plaintiffs the Phoenix Law Enforcement Association and United Phoenix Firefighters Association Local 493, and Defendant the City of Phoenix, from this action. Counts IXXIII of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (the "Immigration Counts") remain pending. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall not close the case at this time. (See document for further details). Dated this 10th day of February, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/10/2022. (LAD)
GPO Apr 20 2022
ORDER IT IS ORDERED denying Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending the Supreme Courts Decision in Biden v. Texas (Doc. 175). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 146) and Plaintiffs' Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery (Doc. 177) remain pending. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 4/20/2022. (AO)
GPO Sep 23 2022
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 146) as follows: 1. the APA claims challenging a general mass parole policy asserted in Counts IX through XII are dismissed; 2. the constitutional claims asserted in Count XIII are dismissed with prejudice; 3. the vaccine Defendants are dismissed as to Counts IX through XIII; and 4. the Motion is denied in all other respects. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/23/2022. (LAD)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
266 266 order Clerks Judgment Tue 01/09 10:55 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed January 9, 2024, judgment of dismissal is entered in favor of Defendants. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (CSL)
Related: [-]
265 265 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 10:51 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the mandate of the Court of Appeals (Doc.264 ), IT IS ORDERED that the Permanent Injunction and the Clerk's Judgment (Docs.165 and166 ) are VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal in Defendants' favor and close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/8/2024. (CSL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
264 264 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 01/05 3:51 PM
MANDATE of USCA re:179 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Zients, Troy Miller, Ur M Jaddou, General Services Administration, John M Tenaglia, Mathew C Blum, Joseph R Biden, Tae Johnson, Office of Management and Budget, Jeffrey A Koses, Phoenix, City of, United States Department of Homeland Security, Deanne Criswell, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Department of Justice, L Eric Patterson, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Robin Carnahan, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Merrick Garland, Shalanda Young, Lesley A Field, Karla S Jackson, Rochelle Walensky, James M Murray, Kiran Ahuja. IT IS ORDERED, the opinion of this court, 67 F.4th 921, is vacated as moot and this appeal is dismissed; and this case is remanded with instructions to vacate the portion of the orders on appeal addressing all claims based on the Contractor Mandate.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Order