Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cynthia Reed Eddy
Case #: 2:17-cv-00292
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2017
Terminated:Mar 10, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 15, 2021 10:06 PM EDT
Defendant
AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant
AETNA MEDICAID ADMINISTRATORS, LLC
Defendant
AETNA, INC.
Defendant
ALICE JEFFERSON
Defendant
JASON ROTTMAN
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Paul E. Skirtich
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Rachael Lee Mamula
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Karen Gal-Or
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
CAROL WESSNER
Represented By
Janel Quinn
The Employment Law Group PC
contact info
Andrew M. Stone
Stone Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 10, 2022
43 43 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/10 1:47 PM
ORDER granting42 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/10/2022. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 03/09 2:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Raspanti, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 14, 2022
41 41 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/14 12:59 PM
TEXT ORDER granting40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint and Summons by AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend the Service Deadline is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall serve the Complaint on or before 3/16/2022 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should Plaintiff fail to serve the Complaint by that time, this action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
40 40 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/11 1:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint and Summons by AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Raspanti, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 13, 2022
39 39 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 01/13 8:19 AM
TEXT ORDER granting38 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Complaint and Summons. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to serve the Complaint is extended to 2/14/2022 . Should Plaintiff fail to serve the Complaint by that time, this action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Counsel of record for Plaintiff shall ensure that she receives a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/13/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Proposed Order part of main document Thu 01/13 10:15 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re38 Motion to Extend Time. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
38 38 motion Extend Time Wed 01/12 12:11 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Complaint and Summons by AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, AETNA MEDICAID ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, AETNA, INC., ALICE JEFFERSON, JASON ROTTMAN. (Raspanti, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
37 37 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/03 1:17 PM
ORDER granting re34 Motion to Extend Time filed by CAROL WESSNER and granting36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by CAROL WESSNER as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/3/21. (ajs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
36 36 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 12/02 10:43 AM
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CAROL WESSNER. (Stone, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
35 35 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 12/02 10:37 AM
BRIEF in Support re34 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint filed by CAROL WESSNER. (Stone, Andrew)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extend Time Thu 12/02 10:32 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to serve complaint by CAROL WESSNER. (Stone, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
33 33 order Order to Unseal Case Tue 09/14 12:21 PM
Order to Unseal Case. In accordance with the Order entered at ECF 32, the Amended Complaint, Notice of Election to Decline Intervention by the United States, and all other matters occurring in this action after 8/31/2021 are hereby UNSEALED. All remaining docket entries will remain under seal and not be served upon Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Relator shall effectuate service within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
32 32 ORDER approving31 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of its election to decline intervention, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/31/2021. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
31 31 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of its election to decline intervention (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
30 30 ORDER granting29 Motion to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case shall remain administratively closed until 8/26/2021, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/25/2021. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
29 29 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
28 28 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Paul E. Skirtich on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Karen Gal-Or terminated. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
27 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, AETNA MEDICAID ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, AETNA, INC., ALICE JEFFERSON, JASON ROTTMAN, filed by CAROL WESSNER. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
26 26 ORDER granting25 Motion to Intervene. The United States shall have up to and including May 26, 2021, within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action, as more fully stated in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/17/2020. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
25 25 MOTION to extend time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
23 23 MOTION for attorney Janel E. Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by CAROL WESSNER. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 declaration,
Att: 2 Ceertificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Receipt
Friday, June 05, 2020
21 21 ORDER granting20 Motion to Extend Time to Intervene. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/5/2020. (nll)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 17, 2020
FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found[LINK:here] . Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's[LINK:administrative order] for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
20 20 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, April 26, 2020
IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found[LINK:here] . Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 28, 2020
IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania (WDPA) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found at[LINK:here] . Currently, multiple attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WDPA e-filing attorneys once the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to the e-filing account. If you have an upgraded PACER account, no action is required until after the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on May 26, 2020. You have an upgraded PACER account if you (1) e-file in another NextGen court, or (2) created your PACER account after August 10, 2014. If neither of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WDPA CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Further informational notices will be sent later, but if you have questions about upgrading your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
18 18 ORDER granting17 Motion to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/26/2019. (sms)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
17 17 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Karen Gal-Or on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Rachael L. Mamula terminated. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
15 15 ORDER granting14 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/1/2019. (sms)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
14 14 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 15, 2019
13 13 ORDER granting12 MOTION to Reset Seal Deadline by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/15/0219. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
12 12 MOTION to Reset Seal Deadline by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, November 19, 2018
11 11 ORDER granting10 Motion to Extend Time to Intervene. The United States shall have up to and including May 21, 2019, within which to notify the Court of its decision to intervene in this action as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/19/2018. (sms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
10 10 SEALED MOTION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 21, 2018
9 9 ORDER granting8 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/21/2018. (sms)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ept)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
7 7 ORDER granting6 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/21/2017. (sms)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
6 6 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ept)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 17, 2017
5 5 ORDER granting4 MOTION for an order partially lifting the seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/17/2017. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
4 4 MOTION for an order partially lifting the seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ept)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 18, 2017
3 3 ORDER granting2 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/18/2017. (sms)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Extend Time to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ept)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 06, 2017
1 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA BETTER HEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, AETNA MEDICAID ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, AETNA, INC., ALICE JEFFERSON, JASON ROTTMAN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668042851), filed by CAROL WESSNER. (jv) (Main Document1 replaced on 3/9/2017) (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Receipt,
Att: 4 Envelope