Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Sara E Hill
Referred: Jodi F Jayne
Case #: 4:21-cv-00393
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2021
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2022 3:25 AM CDT
Claimant
Rachel C McCarthy Trust
Claimant
Brandon C McCarthy
1002 E 20TH ST
TULSA, OK 74119
Represented By
George Steven Stidham
Stidhamlaw, P.C.
contact info
Claimant
Brandon C McCarthy Trust
Claimant
Brachel Real Estate LLC
Claimant
Brachel Marketing LLC
Claimant
Rachel C McCarthy
1002 E 20TH ST
TULSA, OK 74119
Represented By
George Steven Stidham
Stidhamlaw, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
$6,428.18 in United States Currency
Defendant
$791,649.34 in United States Currency
Defendant
2016 Hino Model 268A Box Truck VIN 5PVNJ8JV5G4S60179
Defendant
2017 Audi A7, VIN WAU22AFC4HN102133
Defendant
2020 Lexus GX, VIN JTJAM7BX8L5260873
Defendant
Assorted Gold, Silver and Collectible Coins
Defendant
Atlantic Coast Shipping Containers, Two
Defendant
Fidelity Investment Account Number ZXX-XX2016
Defendant
$59,030.81 in United States Currency
Defendant
1002 E. 20th St., Tulsa, OK
Defendant
$159.39 in United States Currency
Defendant
$122,721.41 in United States Currency
Defendant
$12,736.14 in United States Currency
Plaintiff
United States of America
U.S. Attorney's Office 110 W 7TH ST STE 300
Tulsa, OK 74119
Represented By
Reagan Vincent Reininger
United States Attorney'S Office (tulsa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
86 86 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion for Attorney Fees Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Document(s) Thu 04/17 11:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman Claimants' motion to withdraw (ECF No. 84) their motion for fees is GRANTED; the motion for fees (ECF No. 80) is denied as moot without prejudice to refiling if appropriate ; finding as moot80 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting84 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
85 85 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Refer Motion(s) Wed 04/16 11:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Huntsman Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-] 84 MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) Without Prejudice
84 84 motion Withdraw Document(s) Wed 04/16 10:12 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) Without Prejudice Related [+] by Brachel Marketing LLC, Brachel Real Estate LLC, Brandon C McCarthy Trust, Brandon C McCarthy, Rachel C McCarthy, Rachel C McCarthy Trust (Stidham, George)
Related: [-] 81 Brief in Support of Motion,80 MOTION for Attorney Fees