Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:21-bk-14202

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Wayne E Johnson
Case #: 6:21-ap-01103
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Jan 06, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
2nd Chance Mortgages Inc
Represented By
2nd Chance Mortgages Inc
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Geng
Represented By
Jeremy Geng
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvador Colchado G
1097 Santo Antonio Dr #23
Colton, CA 92324
Represented By
Salvador Colchado G
contact info
Trustee
Rod Danielson (TR)
3787 University Avenue
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, January 06, 2022
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/06 1:46 PM
Adversary Case 6:21-ap-1103 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Defendant Jeremy Geng,14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
Friday, December 03, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/03 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/03 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, December 02, 2021
25 25 court Hearing Held (Motion) Mon 12/06 10:02 AM
Document Hearing Held Vacated Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
24 24 court Hearing Held (Motion) Mon 12/06 9:59 AM
Document Hearing Held Vacated Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Defendant Jeremy Geng
23 23 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 12/06 9:55 AM
Document Hearing Held Vacated Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
20 20 misc Declaration Fri 12/03 3:35 PM
Supplemental Declaration To Status Report re: Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 16 Status report
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
19 19 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Wed 12/01 11:29 AM
Order Denying Motion For Default Judgment. See order for details (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/1/2021. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 12
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Wed 12/01 11:11 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/1/2021 Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 3 Hearing (Bk Other) Set
17 17 answer Opposition Wed 12/01 10:08 AM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Defendants 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Jeremy Geng (Paloci, Henry)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G,14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G,15 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
Monday, November 29, 2021
16 16 misc Status report Mon 11/29 2:36 PM
Joint Status report Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G (EDB) Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
14 14 motion Default Judgment (motion) Wed 11/24 3:08 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Default Judgment . (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
13 13 court Hearing Set(Motion) Tue 11/23 9:55 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
Monday, November 22, 2021
15 15 motion Default Judgment (motion) Wed 11/24 3:09 PM
Motion for Default Judgment with proof of service. Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Default Judgment (motion) Mon 11/22 5:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G 12/22/2021. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Status report Mon 11/22 12:39 PM
Status report Filed by Defendant 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc Related [+]. (Paloci, Henry)
Related: [-] 3 Hearing (Bk Other) Set
Friday, November 19, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Fri 11/19 4:47 PM
Joint Status report Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 08, 2021
9 9 court Hearing Set(Motion) Mon 11/08 1:29 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Defendant Jeremy Geng
Friday, November 05, 2021
8 8 misc Request for judicial notice Fri 11/05 10:11 PM
Request for judicial notice Filed by Defendants 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Jeremy Geng. (Paloci, Henry)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/05 10:10 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Defendants 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Jeremy Geng Related [+]. (Paloci, Henry)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Jeremy Geng
6 6 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Fri 11/05 10:06 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc, Jeremy Geng (Paloci, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
5 5 misc Proof of service Tue 09/28 10:55 AM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
4 4 misc Proof of service Tue 09/28 10:53 AM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 09/21 9:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $0.00 by 31. Receipt Number 60150632. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 09/16 4:17 PM
Hearing Set Status Conference hearing to be held on 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
2 2 court X - Document (Generic) Thu 09/16 4:16 PM
Summons And Notice Of Status Conference In Adversary Proceeding [LBR 7004-1] Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/16 11:50 AM
Adversary case 6:21-ap-01103. Complaint by Salvador Colchado G against 2nd Chance Mortgages Inc , Jeremy Geng. ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) ,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) ,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Romero, Kimberly)
Related: [-]