Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:21-bk-14202

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Wayne E Johnson
Case #: 6:21-ap-01104
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Jan 06, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Special Default Services Inc
Represented By
Special Default Services Inc
contact info
Defendant
Gloria Juarez
Represented By
Gloria Juarez
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvador Colchado G
1097 Santo Antonio Dr #23
Colton, CA 92324
Represented By
Salvador Colchado G
contact info
Trustee
Rod Danielson (TR)
3787 University Avenue
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, January 06, 2022
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/06 1:47 PM
Adversary Case 6:21-ap-1104 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 04, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/04 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/04/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Friday, December 03, 2021
8 8 misc Declaration Fri 12/03 3:37 PM
Supplemental Declaration To Status Report re: Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 6 Status report
Thursday, December 02, 2021
10 10 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 12/06 10:03 AM
Document Hearing Held - Dismissed Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
7 7 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Thu 12/02 10:55 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/2/2021 Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 3 Hearing (Bk Other) Set
Friday, November 19, 2021
6 6 misc Status report Fri 11/19 4:45 PM
Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
5 5 misc Declaration Wed 10/13 2:38 PM
Declaration re: Nonmonetary Status Filed by Defendants Gloria Juarez, Special Default Services Inc Related [+]. (Walker, Katherine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 24, 2021
4 4 misc Proof of service Tue 09/28 11:01 AM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G Related [+]. (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 09/21 9:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $0.00 by 31. Receipt Number 60150633. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 09/16 4:21 PM
Hearing Set Status Conference hearing to be held on 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
2 2 court X - Document (Generic) Thu 09/16 4:21 PM
Summons And Notice Of Status Conference In Adversary Proceeding [LBR 7004-1] Related [+] (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Salvador Colchado G
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/16 12:07 PM
Adversary case 6:21-ap-01104. Complaint by Salvador Colchado G against Special Default Services Inc , Gloria Juarez CEO. ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) ,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) ,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Romero, Kimberly)
Related: [-]