New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:21-cv-05155
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Dec 13, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 15, 2022 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Mohammed Bouzaidi
Defendant
Patriot Energy Solutions Corp.
Plaintiff
Vivian Howlett
Represented By
Thomas J. Lamadrid
Eisner Dictor & Lamadrid, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 05, 2023
10 10 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/05 11:04 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re9 Clerk's Judgment,, entered In favor of Vivian Howlett Against Mohammed Bouzaidi, In favor of Vivian Howlett Against Patriot Energy Solutions Corp. , Jointly and Severally, by Vivian Howlett (Lamadrid, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
9 9 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 12/13 2:37 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Vivian Howlett and against Defendants Patriot Energy Solutions Corp., and Mohammed Bouzaidi, jointly and severally, in the amount of $6,000.00, inclusive of reasonable attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses to date of the offer, in full satisfaction of all of Plaintiff's claims against Defendants arising out, alleged in, or related to, the facts and transactions alleged in the above-captioned action; and that this case is closed.Ordered by Clerk of Court on 12/13/2021. (Toritto, Jim)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 12/13 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Vivian Howlett (Lamadrid, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Acceptance of Offer of Judgment
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/03 4:34 PM
Case Reassigned randomly to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Morabito, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/21 10:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vivian Howlett. Mohammed Bouzaidi waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Patriot Energy Solutions Corp. waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Lamadrid, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/17 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Mohammed Bouzaidi, Patriot Energy Solutions Corp.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 09/17 12:17 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 09/17 12:14 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/17 12:17 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/16 5:03 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Vivian Howlett (Lamadrid, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/16 5:02 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Vivian Howlett (Lamadrid, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/16 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Mohammed Bouzaidi, Patriot Energy Solutions Corp. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14844876 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Vivian Howlett. (Lamadrid, Thomas)
Related: [-]