Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:21-mj-00796
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2021
Terminated:Aug 18, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 17, 2021 3:22 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cynthia Beckwith Smith
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Badetito O. Obafemi (1)
Terminated: 08/18/2021
Represented By
Judy A. Fleming
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/17/2021 4:09 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
Arrest Rule 5 of Badetito O. Obafemi (dmb)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Case Closed. Defendant Badetito O. Obafemi terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Judy Fleming as to Badetito O. Obafemi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/18/2021. (dmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings and Detention Hearing as to Badetito O. Obafemi held on 8/18/2021. Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Waiver filed. (Tape #FTR) (dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by Badetito O. Obafemi (dmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Badetito O. Obafemi. (dmb)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Governments Motion for Detention as to Badetito O. Obafemi (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/18/2021. (dmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Badetito O. Obafemi. Defendant committed to USDC WDMO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/18/2021. (dmb)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act as to Badetito O. Obafemi Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/18/2021. (dmb)
Related: [-]