Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 4:21-cv-12152
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2021
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2022 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By
Sheila A McKeon
Gallagher Sharp
contact info
Adam P. Sadowski
Gallagher Sharp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Troy D'Angelo
Represented By
Benjamin J. Wilensky
Sommers Schwartz, P.C.
contact info
Arvin J. Pearlman
Sommers Schwartz, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Terminated: 01/05/2022
Represented By
Sheila A McKeon
Gallagher Sharp
contact info
Adam P. Sadowski
Gallagher Sharp, LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2021
ORDER to Attend Telephonic Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE AND CALL-IN INFORMATION**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/03 11:28 AM
AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Wed 05/03 11:26 AM
STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/19 10:45 AM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/19/2023. Record concerning settlement created. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
27 27 notice Appear* Fri 04/14 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 04/14 9:58 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Jury Trial on 4/19/2023 is Cancelled. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
26 26 order Pretrial Order - Joint Final Tue 04/11 3:15 PM
JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (EPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Final Wed 03/29 12:51 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/29/2023. Disposition: Case to Proceed to Trial. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
25 25 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Wed 03/22 6:50 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Troy D'Angelo (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Appear* Wed 03/22 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/29/2023 at 11:00 AM (**TIME CHANGE ONLY**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/28 8:45 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial RESET for 4/19/2023 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
23 23 trial Witness List Fri 02/10 1:38 PM
Supplemental FRCP 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures WITNESS LIST by Troy D'Angelo (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
22 22 trial Witness List Fri 02/03 4:35 PM
Pretrial Disclosures FRCP 26(a)(3) Exhibit List and WITNESS LIST by Consolidated Rail Corporation (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
21 21 trial Witness List Fri 02/03 4:17 PM
Pretrial Disclosures FRCP 26(a)(3) Exhibit List and WITNESS LIST by Troy D'Angelo (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
20 20 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 07/05 9:09 AM
STIPULATED ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order. ( Fact and Expert Discovery due by 10/14/2022. ) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
19 19 order Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/26 9:38 AM
ORDER on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
18 18 notice Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 05/25 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Sheila A McKeon for on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/01 12:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2022, Expert Discovery due by 10/14/2022, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/14/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2023 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, Jury Trial set for 4/11/2023 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Related [+] (HRya)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 01/18 8:40 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 1/27/2022 is Cancelled re14 Order to Attend Telephonic Scheduling Conference. The Court will issue a scheduling order pursuant to the Joint Discovery Plan. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
16 16 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Fri 01/14 3:16 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/05 1:06 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Amending Caption. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
14 14 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/20 4:28 PM
ORDER to Attend Telephonic Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE AND CALL-IN INFORMATION** ) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
13 13 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 11/17 2:52 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 11/17 2:51 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consolidated Rail Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation, Corporate Parent Csx, Inc. for Consolidated Rail Corporation. (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/17 2:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/17 12:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
9 9 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 10/06 10:10 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Adam P. Sadowski appearing on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Sadowski, Adam)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 10/06 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila A McKeon on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (McKeon, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 10/05 10:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Consolidated Rail Corporation waiver sent on 9/23/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 10/05 10:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver sent on 9/23/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued* Thu 09/16 8:33 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Norfolk Southern Railway Company* (DPer)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued* Thu 09/16 8:33 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Consolidated Rail Corporation* (DPer)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 09/16 8:32 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 ERRATA Sheet re:2 Notice of Appearance filed by Troy D'Angelo. by Troy D'Angelo ***Corrected Notice of Appearance*** (Wilensky, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilensky on behalf of Troy D'Angelo. (Wilensky, Benjamin)[FILING ERROR: INCORRECT IMAGE UPLOADED; ATTORNEY APPEARANCE FILED AS DOCUMENT NO.3 ] Modified on 9/16/2021 (DPer).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Troy D'Angelo against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8616749 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Pearlman, Arvin)
Related: [-]