Davis v. Great Northern Insurance Company et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Referred: | Alicia O Valle |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-61958 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 16, 2022 4:42 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Great Northern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Great Northern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company, IN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Great Northern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
John Freud
|
|
Plaintiff
Annette Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
263 | 263
![]() MANDATE of USCA (certified copy). We affirm the district court's grant of summary judgment in favor of Chubb re257 Notice of Appeal, filed by Annette Davis; Date Issued: 07/02/2024; USCA Case Number: 23-10137 JJ (jgo) |