Alabama Northern District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-00280
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 18, 2021 2:52 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
USM
United States Marshal
contact info
Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
John G Camp
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
US Probation
United States Probation Office
contact info
M Blake Milner
United States Attornery
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Patricia Annette Milhouse (1)
Terminated: 09/17/2021
Represented By
Marcus Bernard Polson
Polson & Polson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/18/2021 3:32 AM CDT
Thursday, September 16, 2021
Arrest (Rule 5 - MDAL) of Patricia Annette Milhouse (MEB2)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Patricia Annette Milhouse held on 9/16/2021; dft present, rights and charges explained; Attorney M. Polson present; AUSA J. Camp present; USPO E. Kenty present; dft executed Rule 5 wvr; gov't agreeable to bond; dft rel on $5000 u/s bond; hrg adj. (AVC)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 5 - INDICTMENT out of the Middle District of Alabama as to Patricia Annette Milhouse (MEB2) (MEB2).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/16/2021) Redacted Indictment
2 2 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Patricia Annette Milhouse. (AVC)
Related: [-]
3 3 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Patricia Annette Milhouse in amount of $5000. (AVC)
Related: [-]