Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-mj-03851
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Sep 28, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 18, 2021 3:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Eduardo Luis Valdes (1)
Represented By
Nayib Hassan
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elena Smukler
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/30/2022 2:35 PM EST
Thursday, September 16, 2021
Set Hearings as to Eduardo Luis Valdes: Detention Hearing set for 9/17/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (yha)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Eduardo Luis Valdes: Initial Appearance set for 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Bond Hearing set for 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (fbn)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT as to Eduardo Luis Valdes (1). (br)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nayib Hassan appearing for Eduardo Luis Valdes . Attorney Nayib Hassan added to party Eduardo Luis Valdes(pty:dft). (Hassan, Nayib)
Related: [-]
3 3 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing for Afternoon Calendar by Eduardo Luis Valdes. Responses due by 9/30/2021 (Hassan, Nayib)
Related: [-]
4 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Continue as to Eduardo Luis Valdes (1). Detention Hearing set for 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/16/2021. (fbn)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Initial Appearance as to Eduardo Luis Valdes held on 9/16/2021. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 9/16/21. Nayib Hassan temp app. Arraignment set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 9/17/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (Digital 13:33:42/13:49:58) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/16/2021. (dgj)
Related: [-]