California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:21-cv-05400
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Terminated:Oct 15, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 10, 2022 12:58 AM PST
Defendant
Michael H. Moreno
Defendant
Heather Wang
Defendant
Rick Trevino
Defendant
Joseph Tang
Defendant
South County District Attorney
Defendant
South County Criminal Court
Defendant
Santa Clara Family Justice Center
Defendant
Judge Sharon Roper
Defendant
Murat Ozgur
Defendant
Shelly O'Brien
Defendant
Karl Nastrom
Defendant
Moreno Family Law Firm
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marilyn Moreno
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
J. Hector Moreno
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Moles
Defendant
Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Intero Real Estate Services
Defendant
Gomez-Edwards Law Group
Represented By
Louis Harrison Castoria
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Natalie Gomez
Represented By
Louis Harrison Castoria
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Judge Julie Emede
Defendant
Lauren Edwards
Represented By
Louis Harrison Castoria
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian Crane
Defendant
County of Santa Clara
Represented By
Jose Luis Martinez
Office Of The County Counsel, County Of Santa Clara
contact info
Defendant
Birkshire Hathaway Inc.
Plaintiff
Brent Oster
444 Alaska Avenue Suite #BDZ550
Torrance, CA 90503
Plaintiff
Kathia Portuguez Oster


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Friday, October 15, 2021
34 34 order Judgment Fri 10/15 2:04 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
33 33 3 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 10/15 2:03 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
32 32 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 09/29 8:50 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel (Storey, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
31 31 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/28 12:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brent Oster re7 Amended Complaint on Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck on /16/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 09/28 10:40 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel (Storey, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
29 29 misc Joinder Mon 09/27 3:02 PM
Joinder Joinder in the County of Santa Clara's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report & Recommendation ; Request for Stay of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Lauren Edwards, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group. (Castoria, Louis)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/27 11:09 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno, J. Hector Moreno, Marilyn Moreno, Moreno Family Law Firm re27 Joinder (Storey, Joanna)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Joinder Mon 09/27 10:47 AM
Joinder re26 Opposition/Response to Motion, Notice of Appearance by Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno, J. Hector Moreno, Marilyn Moreno, Moreno Family Law Firm. (Storey, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
26 26 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 09/24 11:45 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] - Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report & Recommendations; Request for Stay of Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by County of Santa Clara. (Martinez, Jose)
Related: [-] 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re7 Amended Complaint filed by Kathia Portuguez Oster, Brent Oster
Thursday, September 23, 2021
25 25 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/23 3:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathia Portuguez Oster re24 Objection (slhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Objection Thu 09/23 3:36 PM
OBJECTIONS to13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Brent Oster. (slhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 09/23 11:14 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certifications by Parties and Counsel (Castoria, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
22 22 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 09/22 1:40 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Martinez, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/17 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Luis Martinez for Defendant County of Santa Clara (Martinez, Jose)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/17 9:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lauren Edwards, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group Signed Proof of Service of Delivery of Defendants Natalie Gomez and Lauren Edwards and Gomez Edwards Law Group Objection to Brent Oster (Castoria, Louis)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/17 9:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brent Oster, Kathia Portuguez Oster re7 Amended Complaint as to defendant Edward Gomez, (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/17 9:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brent Oster, Kathia Portuguez Oster re7 Amended Complaint as to defendants Hector and Marilyn Moreno. (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/17 9:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brent Oster, Kathia Portuguez Oster re7 Amended Complaint as to defendants County of Santa Clara (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/17 9:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brent Oster, Kathia Portuguez Oster re7 Amended Complaint as to defendants Berkshire Hathaway/Intero. on 9/15/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/17 8:21 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
14 14 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Fri 09/17 8:14 AM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225] . (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
13 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss and REQUEST for Reassignment to a District Court Judge. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/16/2021. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
12 12 GOMEZ EDWARDS DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS FILING OF ECF NO. 11, "PROOF OF SERVICE" filed by Lauren Edwards, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group. (Castoria, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
11 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Brent Oster of re7 Amended Complaint. (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
10 10 ORDER RE Request for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Re: Dkt. No. 7 . Oster must update his mailing address with the Court and file a consent/declination form by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/27/2021.(lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent/Declination form
Friday, August 20, 2021
9 9 Mail sent to Brent Oster returned as undeliverable re3 Summons Issued. Re-Sent to New Address. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 145 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against Birkshire Hathaway Inc., County of Santa Clara, Brian Crane, Lauren Edwards, Julie Emede, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group, Intero Real Estate Services, Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno, Christopher Moles, J. Hector Moreno, Marilyn Moreno, Michael H. Moreno, Moreno Family Law Firm, Karl Nastrom, Shelly O'Brien, Murat Ozgur, Sharon Roper, Santa Clara Family Justice Center, South County Criminal Court, South County District Attorney, Joseph Tang, Rick Trevino, Heather Wang. Filed byKathia Portuguez Oster, Brent Oster.(sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Part 5
Monday, August 16, 2021
8 8 Mail sent to Brent Oster returned as undeliverable re5 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination, Resent to Updated address. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
6 6 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/30/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/9/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-07828 BLF with 5:21-cv-05400 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/26/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/26/2021) Signed Order
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
3 3 Summons Issued as to Birkshire Hathaway Inc., County of Santa Clara, Brian Crane, Lauren Edwards, Julie Emede, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group, Intero Real Estate Services, Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno, Christopher Moles, J. Hector Moreno, Marilyn Moreno, Michael H. Moreno, Moreno Family Law Firm, Karl Nastrom, Shelly O'Brien, Murat Ozgur, Sharon Roper, Santa Clara Family Justice Center, South County Criminal Court, South County District Attorney, Joseph Tang, Rick Trevino, Heather Wang. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor.(wsnS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt 34611155289). Filed by Brent Oster. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2021.(wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibits Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibits Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibits Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibits Part 5,
Att: 6 Exhibits Part 6,
Att: 7 Exhibits Part 7,
Att: 8 Exhibits Part 8,
Att: 9 Exhibits Part 9,
Att: 10 Exhibits Part 10,
Att: 11 Exhibits Part 11,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 13 Proposed Summons,
Att: 14 Receipt