Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00176
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2021
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 22, 2021 4:34 PM PST
Defendant
Joshua Rahi Hall (3)
Represented By
Adam Leigh Gill
Aisen, Gill & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Christopher Kang (1)
Represented By
Osvaldo E Fumo
Pitaro & Fumo, Chtd.
contact info
Defendant
Dominique Dashon Mcguire (2)
Represented By
Andrew Wong
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jim W. Fang
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/30/2024 3:14 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AF)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Brandon Christopher Kang (1) counts 1, 3-4, 6, 8-9, 12, Dominique Dashon Mcguire (2) counts 1, 10-12, Joshua Rahi Hall (3) counts 1, 2, 4-7, 9, 12. (JQC) Unsealed on 8/4/2021 per #20 Minutes of Proceedings. (AC)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER Sealing Indictment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/22/21. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Brandon Christopher Kang. (JQC)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Dominique Dashon Mcguire. (JQC)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Joshua Rahi Hall. (JQC)
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Grand Jury Return as to Brandon Christopher Kang, Dominique Dashon Mcguire, Joshua Rahi Hall held on 6/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Lorena Quintero ; AUSA: Jim Fang ; Court Reporter/Recorder: Natasha Bachman ; Time of Hearing: 12:16 p.m. to 12:19 p.m. ; Courtroom: 3B ; Warrant to issue. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]