Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:21-bk-33093
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2021
Dismissed:Dec 09, 2021
Terminated:Dec 23, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Designer Diva Resale, LLC
PO Box 420367
Houston, TX 77242-0367
Represented By
Russell Van Beustring
Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Thursday, December 23, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/23 8:12 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 11, 2021
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/11 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Dismissing Debtor(s)
Thursday, December 09, 2021
27 27 order Dismissing Debtor(s) Thu 12/09 2:56 PM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss. Signed on 12/9/2021 (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
26 26 misc Proposed Order Wed 12/08 11:18 AM
Proposed Order RE: (Filed By Designer Diva Resale, LLC ) Related [+] (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Wed 12/08 1:22 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 a.m.. Appearances: Russell Beustring for Debtor; Brendon Singh on behalf of Landlord; Stephen Statham for US Trustee. Minutes: Arguments heard. Case dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Beustring is to circulate a proposed Order which includes the required US Trustee language and upload it with the Court by 5:00 p.m. today. Related [+] (jchavez)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case
Thursday, December 02, 2021
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/02 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
24 24 order Relief from Stay Tue 11/30 9:56 AM
Order Granting Saroj Haddington, LLC's Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay Related [+] Signed on 11/30/2021. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Tue 11/30 9:44 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 a.m.. Appearances: Russell Beustring for the Debtor; Brendon Singh for the Movant. Minutes: Mr. Singh called Manahil Tariq. Ms. Tariq was sworn in. Movant's Exhibits 23-2 and 23-3 were admitted by agreement. Ms. Tariq provided testimony. After hearing arguments, Movant's Exhibit 23-1 admitted. No cross-examination and witness excused. Mr. Singh called Michelle Puckett who was not present by phone. Mr. Singh rested. Arguments by Mr. Beaustring heard. Mr. Beaustring rested. Closing arguments by Mr. Singh. Motion granted. Court to revise proposed Order as stated on the record and sign it. Related [+] (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief From Stay
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
23 23 misc Witness List Wed 11/24 4:48 PM
Witness List (Filed By Saroj Haddington, LLC ) Related [+] (Singh, Brendon)
Related: [-] 21 Courtroom Minutes
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Lease)
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Rental Payments)
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Rental Payment History)
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Lease Amendment)
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (Lease Guaranty)
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
22 22 misc Certificate Tue 11/23 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Saroj Haddington, LLC ) Related [+] (Singh, Brendon)
Related: [-] 16 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Order Setting Hearing
Att: 2 Service List
21 21 court Courtroom Minutes (CM) Tue 11/23 9:47 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 a.m.. Appearances: Russell Beustring for the Debtor; Brendon Singh for the Landlord / Movant. Minutes: Parties announced they could not reach an agreement and were ready to proceed. Michelle Puckett, Debtor representative, was called by Mr. Singh. Mr. Singh moved for admission of Movant's Exhibit at 19-1. Objection by Mr. Beustring was noted by the Court. Due to various technical difficulties regarding Movant's witnesses, matter was re-set to 11/30/2021 at 9:00 a.m. with automatic stay to remain in effect pending further Order by the Court. Related [+] Hearing re-scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 09:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief From Stay
Monday, November 22, 2021
20 20 misc Exhibit List Mon 11/22 6:22 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Designer Diva Resale, LLC ) Related [+] (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief From Stay
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Sunday, November 21, 2021
19 19 misc Witness List Sun 11/21 12:24 AM
Witness List (Filed By Saroj Haddington, LLC ) Related [+] (Singh, Brendon)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief From Stay
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Lease Agreement)
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
18 18 answer Response Wed 11/17 11:16 AM
Response Related [+]. Filed by Designer Diva Resale, LLC (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief From Stay
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/11 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, November 08, 2021
16 16 order Setting Hearing Mon 11/08 11:36 AM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 11/8/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 402 (EVR). (jchavez)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case
Friday, November 05, 2021
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Fri 11/05 7:07 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Creditor Saroj Haddington, LLC (Singh, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
trustee Notice of Reset of Meeting of Creditors Fri 11/05 1:31 PM
Notice of Reset of Meeting of Creditors Please consult original call in instructions to access the meeting 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/18/2021 at 03:00 PM at US Trustee Houston Teleconference. (Statham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held Thu 11/04 3:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor did not appear. Hearing not concluded Related [+] (Statham, Stephen)
Related: [-] Notice of Reset of Meeting of Creditors
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/04 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Order
Monday, November 01, 2021
13 13 order Generic Order Mon 11/01 1:47 PM
Order Chapter 11 Status Conference. on 11/1/2021 Related [+] (jchavez)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Hearing
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Mon 11/01 1:45 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 1:30 p.m.. Appearances: Russell Beustring for the Debtor; Steve Statham for US Trustee. Minutes: Status Conference held. Exclusivity to run 3/21/2022. Court to issue Order with deadlines as stated on the record. Related [+] (jchavez)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference
Monday, October 25, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 10/25 5:58 PM
Status Report (Filed By Designer Diva Resale, LLC ) Related [+] (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, October 22, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/22 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Application to Employ
Thursday, October 21, 2021
trustee Notice of Reset of Meeting of Creditors Thu 10/21 1:04 PM
Notice of Reset of Meeting of Creditors Please consult original call in instructions to access the meeting 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/4/2021 at 02:30 PM at US Trustee Houston Teleconference. (Statham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
10 10 3 pgs order Order to Employ Wed 10/20 10:48 AM
Order Approving Russell Van Beustring, of Russell Van Beustring, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor-in-Possession. Related [+] Signed on 10/20/2021. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
9 9 motion Relief from Stay Tue 10/19 5:59 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay as to the Commercial Real Property located at 10707 Haddington Drive . Fee Amount $188. Filed by Creditor Saroj Haddington, LLC Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (Singh, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
crditcrd none Tue 10/19 6:00 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 21-33093 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23319637. Fee amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 09/28 7:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brendon D Singh Filed by on behalf of Saroj Haddington, LLC (Singh, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
7 7 7 pgs motion Employ Mon 09/27 1:54 PM
Application to Employ Russell Van Beustring as Counsel for Debtor. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor Designer Diva Resale, LLC (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 09/27 9:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John P Dillman Filed by on behalf of Harris County, et al. (Dillman, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/24 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, September 23, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 09/23 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
3 3 order Setting Hearing Wed 09/22 1:08 PM
Order for Chapter 11 Status Conference. Signed on 9/22/2021 Related [+] Status Conference scheduled for 11/1/2021 at 01:30 PM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
2 2 trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING) Tue 09/21 10:27 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/28/2021 at 01:30 PM at US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 12/27/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 1/26/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/21/2022. (Statham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 09/21 10:16 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen Douglas Statham (Statham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
1 1 36 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 09/20 4:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Designer Diva Resale, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 03/21/2022. (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 09/20 4:46 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 21-33093 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23272379. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]