Reyes v. The Maschhoffs, LLC
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sue E Myerscough |
Referred: | Karen L Mcnaught |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-03202 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 19, 2022 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
The Maschhoffs, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rene Reyes
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal lawsuit claims pork producer violated state's laws on biometrics privacy (myjournalcourier.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/12/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/15 8:26 AM
TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice. See d/e15 . Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) provides that "the plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing... a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared." Plaintiff's Joint Stipulation complies with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, this action has been DISMISSED. All pending deadlines and settings are VACATED. Each party to bear its own costs. No judgment to enter. This case is CLOSED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 7/15/2022. (GL) |
||
Monday, July 11, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Rene Reyes. (Beaumont, William) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 05/20 12:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' joint motion to stay. See d/e14 . The parties advise the Court that they have reached a settlement in principle. For the reasons stated therein, the motion is GRANTED. This matter is STAYED pending completion of the parties' settlement negotiations. The parties are DIRECTED to notify the Court once they have finalized a settlement agreement. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/20/2022. (MJC) |
||
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Rene Reyes. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Beaumont, William) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge McNaught
Tue 04/12 7:06 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on April 11, 2022. Due to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught for further proceedings.(LN) |
||
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/30 10:06 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/30/2022. The Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference13 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/22 is VACATED. The parties' deadline to submit a Rule 26(f) discovery plan is 4/29/22.(BMG) |
||
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Rene Reyes. Responses due by 4/12/2022 (Beaumont, William) |
|
Wednesday, January 12, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 01/12 2:35 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Joint Motion to Continue12 is ALLOWED. The parties are exploring settlement in this case. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set 1/25/2022 is CANCELLED and reset Tuesday, 4/5/2022, at 9:30 a.m. before the U.S. Magistrate Judge (court will place call). Discovery plan deadline is reset to 4/1/2022. (LB) |
||
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Joint MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Rene Reyes. Responses due by 1/25/2022 (Costales, Roberto) |
|
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Roberto L Costales on behalf of Rene Reyes (Costales, Roberto) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 12/07 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 1/25/2022, at 10:00 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 1/21/2022. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB) |
||
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge (Caisman, Lauren) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by The Maschhoffs, LLC.(Caisman, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 12/01 9:04 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint8 is ALLOWED. Defendant is given until 12/3/2021 to respond to the Class Action Complaint1 . (LB) |
||
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Defendant The Maschhoffs, LLC. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (Caisman, Lauren) |
|
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William H Beaumont on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Beaumont, William) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Herbert R Giorgio, Jr on behalf of The Maschhoffs, LLC (Giorgio, Herbert) |
|
5 | 5
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) by Defendant The Maschhoffs, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Caisman, Lauren) |
|
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by The Maschhoffs, LLC. (Caisman, Lauren) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lauren Jennifer Caisman on behalf of The Maschhoffs, LLC (Caisman, Lauren) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 10/08 3:53 PM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint5 is ALLOWED. Defendant is given until 11/26/2021 to respond to the Class Action Complaint1 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 10/8/2021. (GL) |
||
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to The Maschhoffs, LLC. Original returned to Attorney William Beaumont to effectuate service. (GL) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against The Maschhoffs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3762406.), filed by Rene Reyes.(Beaumont, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |