Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Charles Goodwin
Case #: 5:21-cv-00927
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2021
Terminated:Nov 05, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 19, 2022 4:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Aargon Agency Inc
Plaintiff
Maia Hutson
Represented By
Tiffany L Hill
Tiffany Hill Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Friday, November 05, 2021
4 4 order Administrative Closing Order Fri 11/05 8:59 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 11/05/2021. (jb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 11/04 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Maia Hutson (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 09/21 10:31 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3765091. (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/20 2:41 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Aargon Agency Inc. (jjs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/20 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Aargon Agency Inc filed by Maia Hutson.(jjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet