California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:21-cv-07325
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2021
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 21CV385614
Last checked: Saturday Mar 19, 2022 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Advanced Clinical Employment Staffing, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Blanche Stallard
Downey Brand LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Chang
Represented By
Ashkan Shakouri
Shakouri Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Smith
Represented By
Ashkan Shakouri
Shakouri Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jun 07 2022
Order denying 13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on June 7, 2022. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER REMANDING CASE re 50 Joint Stipulation to Remand Action to State Court. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 4/29/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 4/29/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
53 53 misc Receipt Thu 05/23 8:29 PM
Acknowledgement of Receipt re52 .(tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]