District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Reggie B Walton
Case #: 1:21-cv-02464
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause27:185 Enforcement of Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2021
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
ARGENTINE REPUBLIC
Represented By
Rathna Ramamurthi
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton, LLP
contact info
Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WEBUILD S.P.A.
Represented By
Thomas C. Childs
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
James E. Berger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info

GPO Nov 19 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 19, 2024. (lcrbw2)
GPO Apr 04 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 4, 2025. (lcrbw2)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
27 27 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 05/02 8:30 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re26 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 05/02 11:06 AM
USCA Case Number 25-7066 for26 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 1 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Thu 05/01 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to25 Order on Motion for Judgment,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,20 Order on Motion to Dismiss by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-11659367. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 04/04 6:05 PM
ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion issued on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the22 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Summary Judgment is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to 22 U.S.C § 1650a and Article 54 of the Convention on the Settlement of Investment Disputes between States and Nationals of Other States the arbitral award rendered in the plaintiff's favor on June 21, 20211, in ICSID Case No. ARB/07/17 (the "Award") is CONFIRMED and that the Award is entitled to full faith and credit in the same manner as a judgment of the Superior Court of the District of Columbia. It is further ORDERED that, in accordance with the Award, judgment is ENTERED against the defendant in the principal amount of $21,294,000.00, plus prejudgment interest on the principal amount, compounded annually at the rate of six percent from July 11, 2006, until the date of this judgment, i.e., April 4, 2025, and post-judgment interest at the statutory rate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 4, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
24 24 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 04/04 6:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 4, 2025. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
23 23 respm Response to motion Wed 01/22 6:46 PM
RESPONSE re22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 motion Judgment Summary Judgment Wed 01/08 2:28 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Summary Judgment by WEBUILD S.P.A..(Childs, Thomas). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/8/2025 (znmw).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 3 pgs Declaration of Thomas C.C. Childs,
Att: 3 Statement of Facts,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
21 21 14 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/03 6:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/19 11:44 AM
ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion issued on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's9 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 19, 2024. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
19 19 23 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 11/19 11:42 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 19, 2024. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 order .Order Tue 10/22 11:53 AM
GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 22, 2024. (lcrbw2) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/22/2024) (zalh).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Telephone Conference Wed 10/09 1:46 PM
ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the16 Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 9, 2024. (lcrbw2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
16 16 motion Telephone Conference Tue 10/08 6:17 PM
MOTION for Telephone Conference / Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference by WEBUILD S.P.A.. (Childs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
15 15 4 pgs respm Response to (non-motion) Document Mon 08/26 5:53 PM
RESPONSE re14 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
14 14 3 pgs notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 08/20 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by WEBUILD S.P.A.(Childs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 3 pgs respm Response to (non-motion) Document Fri 12/15 11:13 AM
RESPONSE re12 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
12 12 3 pgs notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 12/05 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by WEBUILD S.P.A.(Childs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, August 29, 2022
11 11 21 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 08/29 11:29 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
10 10 36 pgs respm Response to motion Mon 08/22 7:23 PM
RESPONSE re9 MOTION to Dismiss | Plaintiff's Opposition to De4fendant's Motion to Dsmiss filed by WEBUILD S.P.A.,.(Childs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration of Thomas C. Childs,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11
Monday, August 08, 2022
9 9 18 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 08/08 11:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ARGENTINE REPUBLIC.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Declaration of Rathna J. Ramamurthi,
Att: 2 23 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/08 10:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rathna Ramamurthi on behalf of ARGENTINE REPUBLIC (Ramamurthi, Rathna)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/08 10:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of ARGENTINE REPUBLIC (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 01/25 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WEBUILD S.P.A.,. Attorney James E. Berger terminated. (Childs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/25 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Childs on behalf of WEBUILD S.P.A., (Childs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 09/23 1:01 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ARGENTINE REPUBLIC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/23 12:49 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
3 3 misc Errata Wed 09/22 3:29 PM
ERRATA attaching Complaint with addresses of the parties included in caption as directed by the clerk by WEBUILD S.P.A., re1 Complaint, filed by WEBUILD S.P.A.,.(Berger, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint incliuding party addresses in the caption
notice Notice of QC- New Case Wed 09/22 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to jberger@kslaw.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Mon 09/20 8:46 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WEBUILD S.P.A., f/k/a IMPREGILO S.P.A. (Berger, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/20 8:44 PM
COMPLAINT against ARGENTINE REPUBLIC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8744730) filed by WEBUILD S.P.A., f/k/a IMPREGILO S.P.A..(Berger, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 90 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 23 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Summons