Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:21-cv-02553
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 19, 2022 4:37 AM MDT
Defendant
Travis Lore
Plaintiff
William Montgomery
2443 South University Boulevard PMB 129
Denver, CO 80210

GPO Aug 17 2022
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 17 August 2022. Defendant should be entitled to qualified immunity because he possessed reasonable suspicion, and Plaintiff has failed to cite to clearly established law. The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS Defendant's Motion 17 be GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed without prejudice. (cmadr, )
GPO Mar 09 2023
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/9/2023, re: 34 Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendations is OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part. ORDERED that the 31 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is OVERRULED in part and ACCEPTED in part. ORDERED that 17 defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) on Qualified Immunity Grounds is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that plaintiff's first, second, and third claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. (jtorr, )
GPO Sep 12 2024
Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2024. (dgumb, ) RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: I respectfully RECOMMEND Defendant's Motion [filed April 23,2024; ECF 64] be GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice. Entered by Magistrate Judge
GPO Feb 04 2025
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/4/2025, re: 79 Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation to Grant Def's MTD PTF's Amended Complaint is OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [Docket No. 77] is OVERRULED in part and ACCEPTED in part. ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) on Qualified Immunity Grounds [Docket No. 64] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that plaintiff's first and second claim are DISMISSED with prejudice.(dgumb, )

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
90 90 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 2:08 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for the Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 5/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2026 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. FTR: C205. (spric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
89 89 order Minute Order Mon 04/28 9:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to communications with the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff may appear telephonically at the 5/01/2025 Status Conference by dialing 571-353-2301 and then entering 198033559#. Any party appearing by telephone shall mute their telephone until the hearing begins and at any time that they are not speaking. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/28/2025. Text Only Entry (cyclc2)
Related: [-]