New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:21-ap-08145
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jon Finocchio
Represented By
Jon Finocchio
contact info
Plaintiff
Mathew Thomas, individually and on behalf of JF & MT, LLC d/b/a A Express
Represented By
Kamini Fox
Kamini Fox, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, March 25, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/25 12:12 PM
Adversary Case 8:21-ap-8145 Closed (rom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Mon 03/14 11:28 AM
Letter of Completion of Case Filed by Kamini Fox on behalf of Mathew Thomas, individually and on behalf of JF & MT, LLC d/b/a A Express (Fox, Kamini)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 02/23 3:04 PM
Settled Without Hearin Related [+] Settled; Order Signed. (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thursday, February 10, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Fri 02/11 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 02/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
14 14 order Generic Order Tue 02/08 10:36 AM
Order Approving Compromise and Authorizing Parties to enter into Settlement Agreement Related [+]. Signed on 2/8/2022 (rom)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Jon Finocchio, Defendant Jon Finocchio
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order Tue 01/25 4:13 PM
Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order; Order to be settled for February 4, 2022 Filed by Rachel S. Blumenfeld on behalf of Jon Finocchio (Blumenfeld, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion Authorizing Parties to Enter into Settlement / 9019
Att: 2 Stipulation of Settlement
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, January 24, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 01/25 2:04 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Kamini Fox, Rachel S. Blumenfeld, Allan Mendelsohn, Fred Kantrow, Jon Mclane Finocchio. Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/23/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (mtt
Monday, December 20, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Mon 12/20 11:51 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; In Person Appearances: Kamini Fox, Rachel S. Blumenfeld, Allan Mendelsohn, Fred Kantrow, Gregory Messer, Jon Mclane Finocchio, Maria Finocchio & on phone Daniel Pereira . Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/24/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
12 12 answer Reply Wed 12/01 1:02 PM
Reply to Counterclaims Against Mathew Thomas Filed by Kamini Fox on behalf of Mathew Thomas, individually and on behalf of JF & MT, LLC d/b/a A Express Related [+] (Fox, Kamini)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Jon Finocchio, Defendant Jon Finocchio
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 22, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 11/22 2:47 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, November 15, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Mon 11/15 11:45 PM
Answer to Third Party Complaint Amended Filed by Rachel S. Blumenfeld on behalf of Jon Finocchio (Blumenfeld, Rachel)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 11/15 11:40 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Jon Finocchio & Mathew Thomas to to Amend Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims Filed by Jon Finocchio. (Blumenfeld, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
9 9 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 11/12 4:10 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from November 22, 2021 to December 20, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Rachel S. Blumenfeld on behalf of Jon Finocchio Related [+] (Blumenfeld, Rachel)
Related: [-] Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Monday, November 08, 2021
8 8 answer|cmp|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim|Third-Party Complaint Mon 11/08 9:35 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by Jon Finocchio against Mathew Thomas, individually and on behalf of JF & MT, LLC d/b/a A Express , Third-Party Complaint by Jon Finocchio against Alveena Chaudry . Filed by Rachel S. Blumenfeld on behalf of Jon Finocchio (Blumenfeld, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 11/01 10:24 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, October 29, 2021
7 7 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 10/29 4:34 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from November 1, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. to November 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Kamini Fox on behalf of Mathew Thomas, individually and on behalf of JF & MT, LLC d/b/a A Express (Fox, Kamini)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
6 6 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 10/18 9:52 AM
Stipulation and Order by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Time for Defendant Jon Finocchio to File Answer. Answer Due 11/5/2021, Related [+]. Signed on 10/18/2021 (rom)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Approve Stipulation filed by Defendant Jon Finocchio
Sunday, October 17, 2021
5 5 motion Approve Stipulation Sun 10/17 12:38 AM
Motion to Approve Stipulation Extending Time to Answer to November 5, 2021 Filed by Rachel S. Blumenfeld on behalf of Jon Finocchio. (Blumenfeld, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/22 2:17 PM
Summons Served on Jon Finocchio 9/22/2021 and these additional parties: Law Office of Rachel S. Blumenfeld . (Fox, Kamini)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Wed 09/22 1:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Jon Finocchio Answer Due: 10/22/2021 Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (rom)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Exhibit Wed 09/22 10:28 AM
Exhibit A - Operating Agreement Filed by Kamini Fox on behalf of Mathew Thomas Related [+] (Fox, Kamini)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mathew Thomas
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/22 10:22 AM
Adversary case 8 21-08145 Complaint by Mathew Thomas against Jon Finocchio. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)). (Fox, Kamini)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Coversheet