DE FERNANDEZ et al v. MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-23400 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 22:6082 Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996 |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Feb 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2022 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LIANA MARIA BLANCO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HEBE BLANCO MIYARES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE M. DELGADO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EMMA RUTH BLANCO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BYRON BLANCO, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 26, 2022 | ||
46 | 46
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Tue 07/26 2:49 PM
FINAL ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Motions terminated:44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction41 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, filed by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 07/25 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO (Gaebe, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 06/28 11:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction41 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,, by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Responses due by 7/12/2022(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Frank R. Sanford in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Maritima Mariel SA Concession, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Confiscation Decree | ||
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/10 2:48 PM
OMNIBUS ORDER granting42 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, by 6/28/2022; Response to Motion due 7/26/2022; Reply to Response to Motion due 8/16/2022; denying as moot38 Motion to Dismiss1 Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot38 Motion to Dismiss1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/09 5:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Motion to Dismiss Briefing and Page Limits by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Responses due by 6/23/2022(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 05/31 4:46 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA, filed by MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, EMMA RUTH BLANCO, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, BYRON BLANCO, JR., EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE.(Boeringer, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 05/18 3:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Motion to Dismiss Briefing Deadlines Joint Motion for Extension of Motion to Dismiss Briefing Deadlines by ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ. Responses due by 6/1/2022(Boeringer, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 05/18 3:47 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING39 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Motion to Dismiss Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiffs shall have until and including Monday, June 6, 2022 , to file their response to38 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall have until and including Monday, June 27, 2022 , to file its reply in support of its38 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/18/2022. (jea) |
||
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 05/09 7:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,,, , MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 5/23/2022) by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Declaration of Frank R. Sanford in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2) Maritima Mariel SA Concession, #3 Exhibit 3) Confiscation Decree)(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/04 11:39 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Sean A. Mirski. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/04 11:37 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Sally Pei. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/04 11:36 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/04 11:17 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John B. Bellinger, III. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Tue 05/03 5:56 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for ROBERT REEVES ANDERSON. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15610636 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Responses due by 5/17/2022(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 CERTIFICATION OF ROBERT REEVES ANDERSON, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Tue 05/03 5:33 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for SEAN A. MIRSKI. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15610580 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Responses due by 5/17/2022(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 CERTIFICATION OF SEAN A. MIRSKI, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Tue 05/03 5:10 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for SALLY PEI. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15610516 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Responses due by 5/17/2022(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 CERTIFICATION OF SALLY PEI, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Tue 05/03 4:53 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John B. Bellinger, III,. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15610184 by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Responses due by 5/17/2022(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 CERTIFICATION OF JOHN B. BELLINGER, III I,, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 05/03 11:35 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/03 10:04 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA identifying Corporate Parent MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company Holding SA for MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA (Ross, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
motion
File Excess Pages
Fri 04/29 7:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA.(Ross, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Order Reopening Case Order to Vacate ~Util - Set Response/Answer Due Deadline
Tue 02/08 3:00 PM
ORDER REOPENING CASE granting25 Joint Stipulation regarding Waiver of Service of Summons, Set Aside of the Entry of Default, and Response to the Complaint; Vacating23 Order,, Vacating22 Clerks Entry of Default; Reopening Case; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company SA response to Complaint due 5/9/2022. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Monday, February 07, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/07 1:22 PM
STIPULATION re23 Order,, Set Response/Answer Due Deadline, by MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA (Ross, Jason) |
|
Saturday, February 05, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 02/05 3:50 PM
NOTICE by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO of Certificate of Service of ECF No. 23 on Counsel for Defendant (Gaebe, John) |
|
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set Response/Answer Due Deadline
Fri 01/28 11:44 AM
ORDER on Final Default Judgment Procedure: Requiring Answer/Response to Complaint, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company SA response/answer due 2/7/2022. Plaintiffs Motion for Final Default Judgment due 2/11/2022; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 01/28 11:46 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls) |
||
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
order
Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
Tue 01/25 8:29 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA - Motions Terminated:21 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/25/2022. (mc) |
|
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 01/24 2:11 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA by ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ.(Boeringer, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Application | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/24 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ(Horr, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Certificate of Service for MSC | ||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 12:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Richard W. Fields. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 12:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Melvin White. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 12:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Martin F. Cunniff. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 12:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Laina Lopez. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 12:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David A. Baron. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) Modified date filed on 11/3/2021 (jbs) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 12:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING5 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Dale Eppler. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/03 10:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING10 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Edward Han. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) |
|
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/27 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA (jbs) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Mon 09/27 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company SA by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO re1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,,, filed by MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, EMMA RUTH BLANCO (Horr, David) |
|
Friday, September 24, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 4:13 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward Han. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15042298 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 4:09 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard W. Fields. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15042244 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 3:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Martin F. Cunniff. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15042139 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 11:50 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Laina Lopez. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15040756 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 11:46 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Baron. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15040727 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 11:41 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dale Eppler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15040693 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 09/24 11:36 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Melvin White. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15040649 by EMMA RUTH BLANCO, LIANA MARIA BLANCO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, BYRON BLANCO, JR., LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Horr, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Bar Letter
Wed 09/22 4:25 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David A. Baron, Melvin White, Dale B. Eppler, Laina C. Lopez, Richard W. Fields, Martin F. Cunniff, Edward Han, mailing date September 22, 2021, (pt) |
|
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) | |
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996
Wed 09/22 1:36 PM
Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 against MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY SA. Filing fees $ 7202.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15034165. This amount includes the filing fee of $ 402.00 for Opening a Civil Action and $ 6,800.00 for this Action, filed by MAGDALENA BLANCO MONTOTO, SUSANNAH VALENTINA BLANCO, EMMA RUTH BLANCO, ODETTE BLANCO DE FERNANDEZ, JOSEPH E. BUSHMAN, MARIA BLANCO LIANA, HEBE BLANCO MIYARES, JACQUELINE M. DELGADO, FLORENTINO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, CARLOS BLANCO DE LA TORRE, GUILLERMO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, LYDIA BLANCO BONAFONTE, SERGIO BLANCO DE LA TORRE, BYRON BLANCO, JR., EDUARDO BLANCO DE LA TORRE.(Horr, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F | ||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 09/22 3:09 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) |